Richard Ruiz v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02389 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 01/12 8:57 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is AFFIRMED. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (klg) |
|
24 | 24
17
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 01/12 8:55 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is affirmed. (see order for further details) (klg) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/28 10:14 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Social Security Case 21 filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Turk, Jean) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Extension of Time to File
Mon 07/31 10:07 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting20 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File (dml) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 07/28 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Social Security Case filed by plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz. (Krank, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit RFC | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 07/28 2:29 PM
APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz. (Krank, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order late brief request | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Tue 07/25 3:10 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File18 . Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and include July 27, 2017, in which to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and that all other deadlines set forth in the March 30, 2017 Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. (hr) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 07/20 2:54 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz.(Krank, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Administrative Record
Fri 06/16 9:51 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Turk, Jean) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 8, | ||
Att: 16 Medical Records Part 9, | ||
Att: 17 Medical Records Part 10 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/16 9:38 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Turk, Jean) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Wed 06/07 3:15 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File14 . Defendant shall have until on or before June 16, 2017 to serve and file the Answer and Certified Administrative Record on Plaintiff. All further dates shall follow in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order in Social Security Cases. (hr) |
|
14 | 14
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 06/07 8:24 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Certified Administrative Transcript - SSA filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Turk, Jean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order To Extend Briefing Schedule | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/26 9:28 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV17-2389 JC on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Tue 04/25 11:43 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Mon 04/10 1:41 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz. (Krank, Laura) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Mon 04/10 1:38 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/10/2017, answer due 6/9/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Krank, Laura) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/31 9:22 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (dml) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Fri 03/31 8:23 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian (1) Electronic Filing (see order for instructions) (2) Service of Summons and Complaint Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint on defendant w/in 30 days of the date of this Order (3) Defendants Pleading to the Complaint Defendants time to plead electronically is 60 days after service of the complaint (4) Waiver of Pre trial Proceedings (see order for information) (5) Cross Motions for Summary Judgment or Remand Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand w/in 30 days of service of defendants answer. Defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand w/in 30 days of service of plaintiffs motion. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) (dml) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/31 8:12 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting5 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Tue 03/28 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 03/28 11:50 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz. (Krank, Laura) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/28 11:48 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz, (Krank, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/28 11:47 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz. (Krank, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/28 11:46 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz. (Krank, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/28 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Richard B. Ruiz. (Attorney Laura E Krank added to party Richard B. Ruiz(pty:pla))(Krank, Laura) |