Westinghouse Electric Company LLC, et al.,
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10751 |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Plan Confirmed: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Westinghouse Electric Company LLC
1000 Westinghouse Dr
Cranberry Township, PA 16066-5228 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Westinghouse Electric Company LLC, et al.,
1000 Westinghouse Dr
Cranberry Township, PA 16066-5228 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2017 4:48 PM EDT |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants
2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Creditor
1000-1100 Wilson Owner LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
375 Metropolitan LLC
701 Seneca Street, Suite 750
Buffalo, NY 14210 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
A.P. Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ABB Inc.
280 Trumbull Street
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ALKAB Contract Manufacturing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Accenture, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Air Products and Chemicals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Airtool Equipment Rental, Inc.
1204 A E Washington St
Greenville, SC 29601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Electric Power
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Equipment Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Home Assurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Tank & Vessel, Inc.
Porter Hedges LLP 1000 Main Street, 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Anderson Dahlen, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arizona Public Service Company
Attn: J. Matthew Derstine 400 E. Van Buren, Suite 1900
Phoenix, AZ 85004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ascendum Machinery, Inc.
P.O. Box 9848
Savannah, GA 31412 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ashmore Concrete Contractors, Inc.
5100 Pierce Court Building A
Evans, GA 30809 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ashmore Concrete Pumping, LLC
5100 Pierce Court Building A
Evans, GA 30809 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Automated Precision, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BFC Industrial Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BNP Paribas
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BackOffice Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Banc of America Credit Products, Inc.
One Bryant Park, 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Blanchard Machinery Company
3151 Charleston Highway
West Columbia, SC 29172 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Boss LTG, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Boss Light Tower Rentals, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bridgewell Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bubba Tool LTD, LLC
1204 A E Washington St
Greenville, SC 29601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bud Behling Leasing, Inc. d/b/a BBL Fleet
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CSC Computer Sciences Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cable USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cannon Sline Industrial, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carolina Fabricators, Inc.
1237 Gadsden Street, Suite 200A
Columbia, SC 29201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Central Electric Power Cooperative, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chemtrade Electrochem U.S. Inc.
400 West Market Street, 32nd Floor
Louisville, KY 40202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cives Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Comanche Peak Power Company, LLC
112 West 34th Street Suite 1515
New York, NY 10120 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Comanco Environmental Corporation
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A. 405 Lexington Avenue 36th Floor
New York, NY 10174 |
|
Creditor
Combined Nuclear Pension Plan Trustees Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of PA, Department of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance Department 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Connecticut Light & Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Construction Forms, Inc.
Husch Blackwell LLP 190 Carondelet Plaza Suite 600
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Curtiss-Wright Electro-Mechanical Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Company Canada
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Service Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cygnus Manufacturing Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cyient Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cyient, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Daikin Applied Americas, Inc.
1237 Gadsden Street Suite 200A
Columbia, SC 29201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dennis Corporation
1204 A E Washington St
Greenville, SC 29601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donlen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donlen Trust, a Delaware Business Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eagle Eye Power Solutions, LLC
4031 W. Kiehnau Ave.
Milwaukee, WI 53209 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ellis & Watts Global Industries, Inc.
4400 Glen Willow Lake Lane
Batavia, OH 45103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Emerson Process Management LLLP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Emerson Process Management Power & Water Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Energy & Process Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Engineered Mechanical Systems
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Envirovac Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
EvapTech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Exelon Generation Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fifth Third Equipment Finance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
FirstEnergy Solutions Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fisher Controls International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GE Betz, Inc.
Glenn Reisman 12 Old Hollow Rd Suite B
Trumbull, CT 06611 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GE Mobile Water, Inc.
12 Old Hollow Rd Suite B
Trumbull, CT 06611 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Garney Companies, Inc.
Lathrop & Gage LLP Stephen B. Sutton 2345 Grand Blvd., Suite 2400
Kansas City, MO 64108 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
General Cable Industries, Inc.
4 Tesseneer Drive
Highland Heights, KY 41076 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Georgia Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gerdau Ameristeel US Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
P.O. Box 9848
Savannah, GA 31412 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Greenberry Industrial, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HYG Financial Services, Inc. f/k/a NMHG Financial Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hamon Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Holcim (US) Inc.
575 Underhill Blvd., Ste. 118
Syosset, NY 11791 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Intergraph Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Intertech Security, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
J.V. Manufacturing Co., Inc.
1603 Burtner Road
Natrona Heights, PA 15065 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jennison Corporation
Jones, Gregg, Creehan & Gerace, LLP 411 Seventh Avenue Suite 1200
Pittsburgh, PA 15219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Johnson March Systems, Inc.
220 Railroad Drive
Ivyland, PA 18794 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jones, Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. and its affiliates and subsidiaries
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
L&S Machine Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Limbach Company LLC
31-35th Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Master-Lee Energy Services Corporation
5631 Route 981
Latrobe, PA 15650 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Metropolitan Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri department of revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475 301 W High St.
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mistras Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Morgan Corp.
P.O. Box 3555
Spartanburg, SC 29334 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Motion Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
N.W. White & Company
1204 A E Washington St
Greenville, SC 29601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
NAES Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Instruments
811 Barton Springs Road Suite 811
Austin, TX 78704 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Newport News Industrial Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nova Machine Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nuclear Fuel Industries, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nuclear Logistics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Obayashi Corporation
Attn: Jasmin Yang 350 S. Grand Avenue, Ste 3100
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oglethorpe Power Corp.
2100 East Exchange Place
Tucker, GA 30084 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oglethorpe Power Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Magnozzi & Kye, LLP 23 Green Street, Suite 302
Huntington, NY 11004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Owen Industries d/b/a Paxton & Vierling Steel Co.
250 West Main Street Suite 2300
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PECO Energy Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PSEG Nuclear LLC
PSEG Services Corporation Law Department 80 Park Plaza, T5D P.O. Box 570
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Penn United Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Office of the Chief Counsel 1200 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prime Piping & Mechanical Inc.
P.O. Box 7416
Gonic, NH 03839 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Public Service Company of New Hampshire
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RSCC Wire & Cable LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Remedial Construction Services, L.P. (Recon)
1885 Saint James Place 15th Floor
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Research Cottrell Cooling, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SAP America, Inc.
Attn: Julia F. Montgomery 6 North Broad Street
Woodbury, NJ 08096 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Saulsbury Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Scana Energy Marketing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Schneider Electric USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sid Tool Co., Inc. d/b/a MSC Industrial Supply Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
South Carolina Electric & Gas Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
South Carolina Public Service Authority
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stein Seal
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC 601 Walnut Suite 470 West
Philadelphia, PA 19106 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation
277 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10172 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TE Connectivity LTD
250 Industrial Way West
Eatontown, NJ 07724 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division PO Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Calvert Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The City of Dalton, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Lane Construction Corporation
1204 A E Washington St
Greenville, SC 29601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Lincoln Electric Company
1300 East Ninth Street, 20th Floor
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thermo Electron North America, LLC and Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thompson Construction Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thompson Services
|
|
Creditor
Turner Industries Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Parcel Service, Inc.
Bialson, Bergen & Schwab 633 Menlo Ave. Suite 100
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vallen Distribution, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vallorbs Jewel Company
369 Lexington Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Veolia ES Industrial Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vigliotti Landscape & Construction, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vigor Works LLC
Tonkon Torp LLP 888 SW 5th Ave., #1600
Portland, OR 97204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
W. O. Grubb Steel Erection Incorporated
4551 Cox Road, Suite 210 P> O. Box 3059
Glen Allen, VA 23058 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WESCO Distribution, Inc.
625 Liberty Ave 23rd Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WESCO International, Inc.
625 Liberty Ave. 23rd Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Weir Valves and Controls USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services, LLC, successor by assignment to Pacific Office Automation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Penn Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westinghouse Electric Company Executive Pension Plan Retiree Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Williams Plant Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Williams Specialty Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Statutory Unsecured Claimholders' Committee of Westinghouse Electric Company LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Aecon Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Aecon Industrial, a division of Aecon Construction Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Airgas USA, LLC and its related entities
259 Radnor-Chester Road Suite 100 P.O. Box 6675
Radnor, PA 19087 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Centrus Energy Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Chicago Bridge & Iron Company N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Columbia Property Trust, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection
Office of Chief Counsel 400 Waterfront Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Day & Zimmermann, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Dominion Nuclear Connecticut, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Doosan Heavy Industries & Construction Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Dresser, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
DuBose National Energy Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Enertech, a Division of Curtis-Wright Flow Control Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Entergy Operations, Inc.
Jones Walker LLP 201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 5100
New Orleans, LA 70170 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ericsson Drive Associates, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
GE Inspection Technologies, LP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Goldman Sachs Bank USA
|
|
Interested Party
HPS Investment Partners, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Johnson Service Group. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mirion Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mizuho Bank, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia
Alston & Bird C/O Dennis J. Connolly 90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pennatronics Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SSM Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Silver Point Finance, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Toshiba Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Transco Products Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
U.S. Nuclear Regulatory Commission
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Dow Jones & Company, Inc.
1211 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
CITIBANK, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
|
Unknown
ABB, AB
280 Trumbull Street
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Apollo Capital Management, L.P., on behalf of certain funds and accounts it manages
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Bigge Crane and Rigging Co.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
CB&I Laurens, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
CBI Services, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Consolidated Pipe & Supply Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Curtiss-Wright Electro-Mechanical Corporation
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston L.L.P. 7501 Wisconsin Avenue, Ste 700W
Bethesda, MD 20814 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corporation
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston L.L.P. 7501 Wisconsin Avenue, Ste 700W
Bethesda, MD 20814 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Clayton Davidson
|
|
Unknown
Electrical Equipment Company
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Gregory Electric Company, Inc.
2124 College Street
Columbia, SC 29205 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
HSG Constructors LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
MHBK (USA) Leasing & Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
William J. Maffucci
|
|
Unknown
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Mitsubishi Nuclear Energy Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Mizuho America Leasing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Nova Machine Products, Inc.
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston L.L.P. 7501 Wisconsin Avenue, Ste 700W
Bethesda, MD 20814 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Novitas Credit Corp.
475 Park Avenue South 18th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Pacific Gas & Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 23 Trust Funds
Johnson & Krol, LLC 311 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 1050
Chicago, IL 60640 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Premier Trailer Leasing, Inc.
575 Underhill Blvd., Ste. 118
Syosset, NY 11791 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Rolls-Royce Civil Nuclear Canada Ltd.
11 S. Meridian St.
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Rolls-Royce Nuclear Field Services France SAS
11 S. Meridian St.
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Rolls-Royce Nuclear Field Services Inc.
11 S. Meridian St.
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
South Carolina Office of Regulatory Staff
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
TP Electric & Power
3252State Route31
Acme, PA 15230 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
The GC Net Lease (Cranberry) Investors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Toshiba Nuclear Energy Holdings (UK) Limited
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
United Electric Englewood Electric Supply
625 Liberty Ave
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
United Rentals (North America), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Virginia Electric and Power Company d/b/a Dominion Virginia Power
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Vision Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Williams Scotsman, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Toshiba's Westinghouse Electric Files for Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/30/2017 | |
2. | Westinghouse Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (nytimes.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/29/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4680 | 4680
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 04/10 12:38 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Kyle J. Kimpler on behalf of W Wind Down Co LLC. (Kimpler, Kyle) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4679 | 4679
motion
Motion, Reopen Chapter 11 Case (Fee)
Tue 04/09 9:34 PM
Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case / Motion to Reopen Bankruptcy Case Pursuant to Section 350(b) of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Kyle J. Kimpler on behalf of W Wind Down Co LLC with hearing to be held on 4/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW) Responses due by 4/16/2024,. (Kimpler, Kyle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Complaint | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 04/09 9:38 PM
Receipt of Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case([LINK 17-10751 mew] ) [motion,1459] (1167.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16582368. Fee amount 1167.00. (U.S. Treasury) |