Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:17-cv-00497
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2017
Terminated:Oct 24, 2018
Last checked: Monday Sep 25, 2017 1:50 AM PDT
Amicus
Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By
Richard M Stephens
Stephens & Klinge LLP
contact info
Defendant
John F. Kelly
Represented By
Stephen J. Buckingham
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Jefferson B Sessions, III
Represented By
Stephen J. Buckingham
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Stephen J. Buckingham
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Seattle
Represented By
Gregory Colin Narver
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Carlton Wm Seu
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Andrew J. Pincus
Mayer Brown Llp (dc)
contact info
Gary T Smith
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Michael K Ryan
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Ori Lev
Mayer Brown Llp (dc)
contact info
Travis Crum
Mayer Brown Llp (dc)
contact info
Joshua Silverstein
Mayer Brown Llp (dc)
contact info
Peter Samuel Holmes
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Karianne M. Jones
Mayer Brown Llp (dc)
contact info
John Lewis
Mayer Brown Llp (dc)
contact info
Charles A. Rothfeld
Mayer Brown Llp (dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Portland
Represented By
Denis M. Vannier
Office Of City Attorney
contact info
Paul J Lawrence
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Kymberly K. Evanson
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Tracy Reeve
Office Of City Attorney
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
63 63 order Judgment by Court Wed 10/24 11:42 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendants (VE)
Related: [-]
62 62 2 pgs order 1 - Order Wed 10/24 11:30 AM
ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING DECLARATORY RELIEF, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. The parties'61 Stipulation is GRANTED. (VE)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
61 61 4 pgs misc Stipulation Fri 10/19 2:28 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING DECLARATORY RELIEF by parties(Seu, Carlton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order