Mad Catz, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10679 |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 10, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2023 |
Debtor
Mad Catz, Inc.
10680 Treena St Ste NO500
San Diego, CA 92131-2487 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
David W. Carickhoff
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Av Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | Gaming peripheral maker Mad Catz files for Chapter 7 Bankruptcy (techspot.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/03/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 08/17/2022 8:14 PM EDT |