InfoGation Corp. v. ZTE (USA), Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Marilyn L Huff |
Referred: | Jill L Burkhardt |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00645 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:0271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 26, 2017 2:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
ZTE (USA), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
InfoGation Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark Closing
Tue 12/05 2:44 PM
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 9,528,843, re Terminated Case. cc:USPTO (mxn) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment
Tue 06/13 1:09 PM
NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by ZTE (USA), Inc. re22 Answer to Complaint - ZTE (USA), INC.S NOTICE REGARDING EXHIBIT ATTACHMENTS A-N TO DOCKET NO. 22, ZTE (USA), INC.S ANSWER TO INFOGATION CORP.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT(Davis, Harold) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N | ||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 3:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand ZTE (USA), INC.S ANSWER TO INFOGATION CORP.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by ZTE (USA), Inc..(Davis, Harold) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Tue 05/09 10:26 AM
ORDER Granting18 Joint Motion to Consolidate Actions and Issue Amended Scheduling Order. Cases Consolidated, 16cv1901 H-JLB; All future docketing will be done in the lead case. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/9/2017. (ag) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Thu 05/04 1:32 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: John P Pennington appearing for Plaintiff InfoGation Corp. (no document attached) (jrd) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/04 12:34 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10048750.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pennington, John)(jrd) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Consolidate Cases
Tue 05/02 4:10 PM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases Related Actions and to Modify Case Management Schedule by InfoGation Corp.. (Kirby, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Wed 04/26 12:46 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: John P. Moy appearing for Plaintiff InfoGation Corp. (no document attached) (jrd) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/26 12:27 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10025078.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Moy, John)(jrd) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Wed 04/26 10:11 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Edward A. Pennington appearing for Plaintiff InfoGation Corp. (no document attached) (jrd) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Wed 04/26 10:10 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Sean T. C. Phelan appearing for Plaintiff InfoGation Corp. (no document attached) (jrd) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/26 7:32 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10023457.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Pennington, Edward)(jrd) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/25 12:41 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10020862.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Phelan, Sean) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Fri 04/21 10:56 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Darlene Kao Tzou appearing for Plaintiff InfoGation Corp. (no document attached) (kcm) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/20 2:56 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10009876.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Tzou, Darlene) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/14 8:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against InfoGation Corp., filed by InfoGation Corp.. (Kirby, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/14 4:24 PM
ORDER Granting7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file any response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 6/12/2017. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/14/2017. (ag) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/14 2:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ZTE (USA), Inc.. (Davis, Harold)Attorney Harold H. Davis added to party ZTE (USA), Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule
Fri 04/07 3:23 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:16-cv-01901-H-JLB. The new case number is 17cv0645 H-JLB. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/5/2017. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/5/2017. (fth) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Related Case
Thu 04/06 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by InfoGation Corp. of case(s) 16-cv-01901; 16-cv-01902; 16-cv-01903; 17-cv-0646;17-cv-0647 re1 Complaint, . (Kirby, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/30 12:35 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mxn) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM
Thu 03/30 12:31 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *9,528,843* cc:USPTO (mxn) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Thu 03/30 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by InfoGation Corp. No Parties With Financial Interest. (mxn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/30 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ZTE (USA), Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-9945721.), filed by InfoGation Corp. The new case number is 3:17-cv-645-AJB-JLB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Kirby, Michael)(mxn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |