Timothy Morrison v. Mauro Santoyo et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02540 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 30, 2017 2:19 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
Mauro Santoyo
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Timothy Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mauro Santoyo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Pan-American Properties, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
77 | 77
order
Dismiss Case
Tue 09/04 10:15 AM
ORDER: (1) APPROVING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS CASE AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND (2) DISMISSING CASE, WITH PREJUDICE76 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: On February 6, 2017, Timothy Morrison, an individual, (Plaintiff) filed suitindividually and derivatively on behalf of Pan-American Properties, LLC(collectively, Plaintiffs) against Defendant, Mauro Santoyo (Defendant) inSuperior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). On August 21, 2018, all the parties to this action jointly filed a joint stipulation to dismiss case and notice of settlement as to all matters and as to all parties. Based on the foregoing and good cause appearing therefor:1. The Joint Motion for Dismissal is granted. 2. The Settlement Notice and Stipulation of the parties providing notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice of all claims and counterclaims and defenses as filed in this action as to all parties is approved. 3. The case is dismissed, with prejudice pursuant to the agreed settlement of the parties. 4. As no plaintiff, defendants, or cross-defendants remain in this action, the Clerk is directed and ordered to CLOSE the case. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (ab) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
76 | 76
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/24 9:53 AM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Notice of Settlement filed by Defendant and Counterclaimaint Mauro Santoyo. (Martinez, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |