Washington Western District Court
Judge:Ronald B Leighton
Case #: 3:17-cv-05244
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2017
Terminated:Aug 04, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Sep 30, 2017 3:44 AM PDT
Defendant
Mylan Specialty, L.P.
Represented By
Thomas L Boeder
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Susan E Foster
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
David A. Perez
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Kollmeyer
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Jennifer Fountain Connolly
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (dc)
contact info
Craig L Briskin
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amber Rainey
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Jennifer Fountain Connolly
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (dc)
contact info
Craig L Briskin
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Vogel
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Jennifer Fountain Connolly
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (dc)
contact info
Craig L Briskin
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
29 29 transfer Case Transferred Out - Email notification Tue 08/08 8:41 AM
TRANSFERRED CASE opened in Kansas as case 2:17-cv-2449 on 8/4/2017. (RS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2017
28 28 misc MDL Transfer Order Fri 08/04 11:46 AM
MDL 2785 TRANSFER ORDER in re Epipen (Epinephrine Injection, USP) Marking, Sales Practices and Antitrust Litigation ; District of Kansas; assigned to Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. (SWT)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/04 11:49 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (SWT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public, notice to parties) Thu 06/15 9:43 AM
Noting Date Reset re17 MOTION to Transfer Case : Waiting on MDL panel to make a ruling; new Noting Date 7/28/2017, (DN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
27 27 order 2 - Minute Order Wed 06/07 11:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER re21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer under section 1404 ; Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time [Dkt. #21] is GRANTED and their response to the Defendant's Motion to Transfer under Section 1404 is due 14 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules on the pending motion to transfer under Section 1407. The Court's June 6 Order [Dkt. #26] Granting the alternate, unopposed Motion for an extension of time [Dkt. #25] is VACATED as MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED. As directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Tue 06/06 10:58 AM
ORDER granting21 25 Plaintiffs' Motions for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer; Plaintiff shall respond 14 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules on the pending motion to transfer under 28 USC 1407; signed signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
25 25 motion Extension of Time-Other Mon 06/05 4:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Under § 1404 , filed by Plaintiffs Christina Kollmeyer, Amber Rainey, Lisa Vogel. Noting Date 6/16/2017, (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
24 24 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/31 3:34 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Mylan Specialty, L.P., to21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer under section 1404 . (Boeder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2017
23 23 respm Proposed Order (Unsigned) Thu 05/25 6:20 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer under section 1404 (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Declaration Thu 05/25 6:18 PM
DECLARATION of Jennifer Fountain Connolly filed by Plaintiffs Christina Kollmeyer, Amber Rainey, Lisa Vogel re21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer under section 1404(Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mylan's Opposition to Nordstrum's Motion to Transfer,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Emails between counsel
21 21 motion Extension of Time-Other Thu 05/25 6:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer under section 1404 , filed by Plaintiffs Christina Kollmeyer, Amber Rainey, Lisa Vogel. Noting Date 6/2/2017, (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2017
20 20 order Order on Stipulated Motion Fri 05/19 3:48 PM
ORDER granting19 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
19 19 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 05/17 3:40 PM
Second Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint , filed by Defendant Mylan Specialty, L.P.. Noting Date 5/17/2017, (Boeder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 respm Declaration Wed 05/17 3:33 PM
DECLARATION of Thomas L. Boeder filed by Defendant Mylan Specialty, L.P. re17 MOTION to Transfer Case(Boeder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
17 17 motion Transfer Case Wed 05/17 3:30 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendant Mylan Specialty, L.P.. Noting Date 6/9/2017, (Boeder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 15, 2017
16 16 notice Notice-Other Tue 05/16 3:15 PM
NOTICE by plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis US LLC's opposition to motion to transfer before MDL Panel; in re Epipen Marketing and Sales; MDL 2785(RS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
15 15 notice Notice-Other Tue 05/09 11:39 AM
NOTICE of consolidated plaintiffs' response in opposition to the motion for transfer and consolidation of actions filed with MDL Panel re MDL 2785 (RS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
14 14 misc Letter Thu 05/04 10:49 AM
LETTER from Steve W. Berman(Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transcript of Hearing,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Motion to Stay
Monday, May 01, 2017
13 13 order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/01 2:36 PM
ORDER granting10 Stipulated Motion; Mylan Specialty, L.P. answer due 5/22/2017; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/01 10:43 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Mylan, Inc., Other Affiliate Abbott Laboratories, Other Affiliate Dey Inc., Other Affiliate Dey Limited Partner LLC, Other Affiliate Mylan N.V. for Mylan Specialty, L.P.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mylan Specialty, L.P. (Boeder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/28 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas L Boeder on behalf of Defendant Mylan Specialty, L.P.. (Boeder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 04/28 8:29 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint , filed by Defendant Mylan Specialty, L.P.. Noting Date 4/28/2017, (Boeder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 05/01 11:36 AM
Attorneys Susan E Foster and David A. Perez added for Mylan Specialty, L.P. per the11 Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas Boeder. (CMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
9 9 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/26 1:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER Striking7 Joint Status Report Order deadlines pending a motion to transfer and consolidate this case in MDL to the District of New Jersey. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
8 8 order Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM) Mon 04/10 1:51 PM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Mon 04/10 1:51 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/26/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/3/2017, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
6 6 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/04 10:59 AM
ORDER as to the4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Craig L Briskin for Plaintiffs Christina Kollmeyer, Amber Rainey, and Lisa Vogel; by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (GMR)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/04 10:57 AM
ORDER as to the3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jennifer Fountain Connolly for Plaintiffs Christina Kollmeyer, Amber Rainey, and Lisa Vogel; by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (GMR)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/04 8:36 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Craig L. Briskin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Christina Kollmeyer, Amber Rainey, Lisa Vogel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4828558 (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/04 8:35 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jennifer Fountain Connolly FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Christina Kollmeyer, Amber Rainey, Lisa Vogel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4828555 (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/03 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant(s) Mylan Specialty, L.P.. (MET)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/03 8:00 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mylan Specialty, L.P. with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Christina Kollmeyer(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Amber Rainey(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Lisa Vogel(pty:pla), filed by Amber Rainey, Lisa Vogel, Christina Kollmeyer.(Berman, Steve)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-4826926
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/03 11:33 AM
Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (MET)
Related: [-]