Payless Inc
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-42267
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-42267
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kathy A Surratt-States |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-42298 |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | Over 100,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Payless Inc
3231 Southeast Avenue
Topeka, KS 66607 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
1. | Payless ShoeSource files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy, plans to close 400 stores (latimes.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/05/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Saturday, March 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 03/03 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/03/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Final Decree
Thu 03/01 3:33 PM
Final Decree . (jer, j) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 03/01 3:34 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (jer, j) |
||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
10
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 02/21 12:18 PM
Order Granting (2147 in case 17-42267 Application to for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Administrative Consolidation of Claims Filed in Certain Jointly Administred Chapter 11 Cases, (II) Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases, and (III) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor Payless Holdings LLC . (jer, j) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Document
Thu 04/06 10:55 AM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Payless Holdings LLC;Payless Intermediate Holdings LLC; WBG-PSS Holdings LLC;Payless Inc.; Payless Finance, Inc.; Collective Brands Services,Inc.; PSS Delaware Company 4, Inc.; Shoe Sourcing, Inc.; Payless ShoeSource, Inc.; Eastborough, Inc.; Payless Purchasing Services, Inc.; Payless ShoeSource Merchandising, Inc.; Payless Gold Value CO, Inc.; Payless ShoeSource Distribution, Inc.; Payless ShoeSource Worldwide, Inc.; Payless NYC, Inc.; Payless ShoeSource of Puerto Rico, Inc.; Payless Collective GP, LLC;Collective Licensing, L.P.; Collective Licensing International, LLC; Clinch, LLC; Collective Brands Franchising Services, LLC;Payless International Franchising, LLC; Collective Brands Logistics Limited; Dynamic Assets Limited; PSS Canada, Inc.;Payless ShoeSource Canada Inc.; Payless ShoeSource Canada GP Inc.; and Payless ShoeSource Canada LP. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 17-42267 659. (jer, j) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 04/06 10:54 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (jer, j) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/05 2:34 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-42298 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 13692404, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
62
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11)
Tue 04/04 5:46 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Payless Inc Government Proof of Claim due by 10/2/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/18/2017.Schedule A/B due 4/18/2017. Schedule C due 4/18/2017. Schedule D due 4/18/2017.Schedule E/F due 4/18/2017. Schedule G due 4/18/2017. Schedule H due 4/18/2017. Schedule I due 4/18/2017. Schedule J due 4/18/2017. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 4/18/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/18/2017. Chapter 11 Income Form 122B due 4/18/2017. Credit Counseling Date: 4/18/2017. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/2/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 08/2/2017. (Cousins, Steven) |