George Street Investors, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10554
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10554
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Deborah L Thorne |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10806 |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
George Street Investors, LLC
1307 N. Clybourn Ave., Suite A
Chicago, IL 60610 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 04/04/2017 7:00 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
16
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11a)
Wed 04/05 2:55 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717, Filed by Scott R Clar on behalf of George Street Investors, LLC (Clar, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/05 3:03 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10806 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 34291455. Fee Amount $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Cash Collateral (Use)
Wed 04/05 3:51 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Use Cash Collateral thru: May 7, 2017 Filed by Scott R Clar on behalf of George Street Investors, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/13/2017 at 09:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Clar, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Authorize
Wed 04/05 3:57 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Authorize Debtor to Use Existing Bank Account Filed by Scott R Clar on behalf of George Street Investors, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/13/2017 at 09:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Clar, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
court
Judge Not Sitting
Wed 04/05 4:19 PM
Hearing set 4/13/2017 at 09:30 AM is Stricken, Judge Not Sitting . (McClendon, Annette) |