Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Benita Y Pearson |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00714 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 02, 2017 5:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
50 W. Broad Street, Suite 1800
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Plaintiff
Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation & Order
Wed 08/16 4:42 PM
Stipulation & Order approving10 Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of all claims against Defendant with Prejudice. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/16/2017. (E,CK) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Tue 07/25 2:11 PM
Amended Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. (Farnan, John) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 07/05 12:46 PM
Marginal Order approving8 Notice of Dismissal. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/5/2017. (JLG) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Wed 07/05 10:36 AM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. (Farnan, John) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/17 12:46 PM
Order granting Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shane R. Heskin for Plaintiff Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. . Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/17/2017. (JLG) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/13 2:40 PM
Motion for attorney Shane R. Heskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8113525, filed by Plaintiff Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company.(Farnan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Wed 04/05 4:49 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (T,Je) |
|
4 | 4
oth_doc
Supplement
Wed 04/05 4:30 PM
Supplement Summons to1 Complaint, filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. Related document(s)1 . (Farnan, John) |
|
3 | 3
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake
Wed 04/05 4:04 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided or issued. (T,Je) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/05 3:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Columbia Insurance Company for Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. (Farnan, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/05 3:00 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8100757. Filed by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. (Farnan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 04/05 3:53 PM
Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (T,Je) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/05 3:54 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je) |