Rahim v. Thrash et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | David C Norton |
Referred: | Bristow Marchant |
Case #: | 9:17-cv-00896 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 03, 2017 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jane Doe Horn
|
|
Defendant
John Horn
|
|
Defendant
Harold L Murphy
|
|
Defendant
Jane Doe Murphy
|
|
Defendant
Jane Doe Thrash
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Thrash, Jr
|
|
Plaintiff
Ras Imhotep Rahim
54889-019 Estill FCI P.O. Box 699
Estill, SC 29918 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Document Mailed
Tue 05/01 10:24 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED14 Judgment,13 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation placed in U.S. Mail to Ras Imhotep Rahim (jbry, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Document Mailed
Wed 08/09 2:29 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED14 Judgment,13 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation placed in U.S. Mail to Ras Imhotep Rahim (jbry, ) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Judgment
Wed 08/09 2:28 PM
JUDGMENT The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Marchant is adopted and the case is DISMISSED without prejudice.(jbry, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 08/08 4:13 PM
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION The court ADOPTS the R&R, ECF No. 10, and dismisses this case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/8/2017. (jbry, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Wed 07/26 2:14 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge David C Norton. Judge C Weston Houck no longer assigned to the case. (suro) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Document Mailed
Tue 07/18 4:21 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by Ras Imhotep Rahim placed in U.S. Mail to Ras Imhotep Rahim. (cwhi, ) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 07/18 4:21 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant. It is recommended that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, in accordancewith Rule 41, Fed.R.Civ.P. Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 7/18/2017. (cwhi, ) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Document Mailed
Fri 06/16 12:18 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED8 Proper Form Order, and required documents placed in U.S. Mail to Ras Imhotep Rahim. (cwhi, ) |
|
8 | 8
order
Proper Form Order
Fri 06/16 12:17 PM
PROPER FORM ORDER. Case to be brought into proper form by 7/7/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 6/16/2017.(cwhi, ) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/06 2:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ras Imhotep Rahim.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(cwhi, ) |
|
Att: 1 Transaction History, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/06 2:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Jane Doe Horn, John Horn, Harold L Murphy, Jane Doe Murphy, Jane Doe Thrash, Thomas Thrash, Jr, filed by Ras Imhotep Rahim.(cwhi, ) (cwhi, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-F, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Att: 4 (4/6/2017) Proposed Order |