Davis v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cynthia Bashant |
Referred: | Andrew G Schopler |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00701 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331tt Fed. Question: Tort Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 03, 2017 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Gregory Unruh
|
|
Plaintiff
Gavin B. Davis
925 Resaca
Cibolo, TX 78108 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation
Terminated: 09/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 01/08 11:08 AM
MANDATE of USCA dismissing the appeal as to22 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Gavin B. Davis. (akr) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 11/14 12:28 PM
ORDER of USCA as to22 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit filed by Gavin B. Davis. A review of the record demonstrates that the USCA lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. Dismissed. (akr) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
USCA Time Schedule Order
Fri 09/29 2:59 PM
USCA Time Schedule Order as to22 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit filed by Gavin B. Davis. (akr) |
|
23 | 23
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 09/29 2:58 PM
USCA Case Number 17-56487 for22 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit filed by Gavin B. Davis. (akr) |
|
22 | 22
appeal
Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit
Fri 09/29 1:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to21 Order, by Gavin B. Davis. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt no. CAS094758.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (akr) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Service by Publication Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 09/28 10:35 AM
ORDER granting Federal Bureau of Investigations'18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying Plaintiff's13 Motion to Add New Defendants; denying Plaintiff's7 Motion for Sanctions; denying Plaintiff's17 Motion for Service by Publication; denying Plaintiff's17 Motion for Mental Examination. Court grants the FBI's Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Court dismisses sua sponte the remaining claims against Defendant Unruh, but gives Plaintiff leave file an Amended Complaint against Unruh only. Any Amended Complaint must address the concerns expressed by the Court in this Order, and must be filed by 10/20/2017. The remaining motions7 ,15 ,17 are dismissed as moot or withdrawn Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 09/05 4:45 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; and Proof of Service filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Manahan, George) (lrf) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/01 1:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction iled by Gavin B. Davis. (jah) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 08/17 5:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 7) by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Manahan, George)Attorney George Vincent Manahan added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities and Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Crum Declaration | ||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/14 3:15 PM
MOTION for Examination of Defendant Greg Pursuant to FRCP 35 by Gavin B. Davis. NUNC PRO TUNC 6/30/2017. (jah) |
|
16 | 16
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Fri 07/14 3:12 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Accepting Document: FRCP 35 Motion for Examination - Defendant Greg, from Plaintiff Gavin B. Davis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/30/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Service by Publication
Fri 07/14 3:08 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication by Gavin B. Davis. NUNC PRO TUNC 6/30/2017. (jah) (Main Document 15 replaced on 7/14/2017) (jah) |
|
14 | 14
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Fri 07/14 3:07 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Accepting Document: Request for Publication of Summons, from Plaintiff Gavin B. Davis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/30/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/14 2:42 PM
MOTION to Add New Defendant by Gavin B. Davis. NUNC PRO TUNC 7/11/2017. (jah) |
|
12 | 12
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Fri 07/14 2:38 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Accepting Document: Interpleader Action - New Defendant, from Plaintiff Gavin B. Davis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 7/11/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/10 11:26 AM
Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Judge Dana M. Sabraw hereby recuses from this case, and new Judge randomly assigned. Judge Dana M. Sabraw is no longer assigned to case and Judge Cynthia Bashant is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 17cv0701 BAS-AGS. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jak) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 07/06 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Gavin B. Davis. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc on 7/5/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth) |
|
9 | 9
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Thu 07/06 10:53 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler Accepting Document: Notice of Change of Address, from Plaintiff Gavin B. Davis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex Parte Communication. Nunc Pro Tunc 7/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/6/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 07/03 4:16 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Docket Sheet. Mail sent to Gavin B. Davis. (fth) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Sanctions
Wed 06/28 11:39 AM
MOTION for Sanctions by Gavin B. Davis. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/26/2017. (aef) |
|
6 | 6
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Wed 06/28 11:15 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Motion for Sanctions, from Plaintiff Gavin B. Davis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/26/2017. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/28/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 06/27 2:29 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re docket sheet. Mail sent to Gavin B. Davis. (akr) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Order
Thu 04/13 10:28 AM
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's3 Request for Service by U.S. Marshal Service. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/13/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Order
Thu 04/06 11:40 AM
Motion for U.S. Marshall for Service on Defendant Greg for Cause by Gavin B. Davis. (lrf) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/06 11:20 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/06 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Federal Bureau of Investigation, John Gregory Unruh (Filing fee $400 receipt number CAS090073), filed by Gavin B. Davis. The new case number is 3:17-cv-701-DMS-AGS. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Davis, Gavin B.)(lrf) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |