Matice v. Unnamed
Iowa Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Linda R Reade |
Referred: | Cj Williams |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00022 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 04, 2017 5:04 AM CDT |
Petitioner
Roger Dean Matice
47448-379 SEAGOVILLE FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 9000
SEAGOVILLE, TX 75159 |
|
Respondent
Unnamed
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment
Tue 08/08 12:50 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Unnamed against Roger Dean Matice: Plaintiff take nothing and this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk on 8/8/2017 (copy w/NEF mailed to Plt). (skm) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order
Tue 08/08 12:44 PM
ORDER re1 Pro Se Petition Under Interstate Agreement on Detainers Act filed by Roger Dean Matice. The court is unsure what type of action, if any, that the plaintiff is trying to commence. In light of the foregoing, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 8/8/2017 (copy w/NEF mailed to Plt). (skm) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Dismissal Ddl)
Fri 04/07 4:11 PM
PETITION Under Interstate Agreement on Detainers Act against Iowa, State of filed by Roger Dean Matice. Dismissal Deadline 7/19/2017. (NEF mailed to petitioner) (pac) |