United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. Studio City View Apartments, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02693 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 04, 2017 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Studio City View Apartments, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
David Singletary
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United African-Asian Abilities Club
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 09/13 6:39 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff United African-Asian Abilities Club. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Wakefield, David) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismissing Case
Mon 07/10 11:19 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter: In the Notice of Settlement filed on 7/6/2017, Dkt. No. 10, the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before 8/25/2017. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement until 8/25/2017. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the dismissal of this action will be with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Settlement
Thu 07/06 8:24 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff United African-Asian Abilities Club. (Wakefield, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 04/12 3:12 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
8 | 8
testxtonly
(TERMED) Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/12 3:12 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge John F. Walter. If not yet provided, courtesy copies of all case opening documents shall be delivered to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 13, 2017. Failure to comply may result in an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal and/or Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 04/10 2:36 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Studio City View Apartments, LLC. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 04/10 2:28 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 04/10 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 04/07 11:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff UNITED AFRICAN-ASIAN ABILITIES CLUB. (Wakefield, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/07 11:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff UNITED AFRICAN-ASIAN ABILITIES CLUB, (Wakefield, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 04/07 11:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED AFRICAN-ASIAN ABILITIES CLUB. (Wakefield, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 04/07 11:49 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19653691 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff UNITED AFRICAN-ASIAN ABILITIES CLUB. (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party UNITED AFRICAN-ASIAN ABILITIES CLUB(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |