HARMON et al v. BOROUGH OF BELMAR et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Peter G Sheridan |
Referred: | J Brendan Day |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02437 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Feb 01, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 07, 2017 6:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
TED BIANCHI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TINA SCOTT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT POFF
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THOMAS PALMISANO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JENNIFER NICOLAY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRIAN MAGOVERN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LOKO, LLC
|
|
Defendant
JANIS KEOWN-BLACKBURN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOES
|
|
Defendant
ANDREW HUISMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MATTHEW DOHERTY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THOMAS COX
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
COLLEEN CONNOLLY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THOMAS BRENNAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BOROUGH OF BELMAR
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BELMAR BOROUGH AGENTS, EMPLOYEES, APPOINTEES, REPRESENTATIVES, CONSULTANTS AND/OR OFFICIALS
|
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY HARMON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MATTHEW HARMON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOCKSIDE DINING, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DCJ BELMAR, INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TWO DAWGS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Harmons Amend $10 Million Federal Lawsuit against Belmar over Rejection of Liquor License Transfer (tapinto.net) |
Submitted Wed 04/04/2018 | |
2. | $10M lawsuit filed against Borough of Belmar over Outdoor Bar Fight (tapinto.net) |
Submitted Wed 04/12/2017 | |