New York Southern District Court
Judge:Naomi Reice Buchwald
Case #: 1:17-cv-02576
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2017
Terminated:Aug 02, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Oct 07, 2017 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
New England Sports Network, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen M. Kramarsky
Dewey, Pegno & Kramarsky, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Storms
Represented By
Richard Liebowitz
Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Yekaterina Tsyvkin
Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
14 14 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted Wed 3:47 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 8/02/2017 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ama)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Information of Copyright
13 13 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 3:07 PM
STIPULATION DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the Plaintiff Michael Storms, and counsel for the Defendant, New England Sports Network Inc., that all claims asserted in the above-captioned action are dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/02/2017) (ama)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12:24 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH PREJUDICE prejudice against the defendant(s) New England Sports Network, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Michael Storms.(Liebowitz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 8:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yekaterina Tsyvkin on behalf of Michael Storms. (Tsyvkin, Yekaterina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 3:42 PM
ORDER: granting6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. Answer due by 6/2/2017. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/3/2017) (ap)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 3:43 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: New England Sports Network, Inc. answer due 6/2/2017. (ap)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
6 6 motion Extension of Time Mon 3:24 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Stephen M. Kramarsky dated 5/01/2017. Document filed by New England Sports Network, Inc..(Kramarsky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Kramarsky on behalf of New England Sports Network, Inc.. (Kramarsky, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form Wed 6:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jvs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 4:17 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New England Sports Network, Inc. (jvs)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 4:14 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jvs)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 4:14 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. (jvs)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 4:15 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jvs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 11:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 11:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New England Sports Network, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Storms. (Liebowitz, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11:43 PM
COMPLAINT against New England Sports Network, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13526977)Document filed by Michael Storms.(Liebowitz, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C