DOE v. TREDYFFRIN/ EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anita B Brody |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01589 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1415(e)(2) Individuals with Disabilities Education Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 04, 2017 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
TREDYFFRIN/ EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Wed 08/16 4:41 PM
ORDER THAT LEAVE IS GRANTED FOR THE PLAINTIFF TO SETTLEMENT THIS MATTER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/16/2017. 8/16/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Application/Petition
Wed 08/09 12:23 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Leave to Compromise Minor's Action by JANE DOE.(WOODY, DENNIS) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit Release and Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Correspondence documenting settlement | ||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Fri 08/04 12:23 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 8/4/2017. 8/4/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 07/28 8:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE Settlement Conference held on 7/26/17. (jaa, ) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/23 5:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Defendants Answer with Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs Complaint by TREDYFFRIN/ EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT.(CAULEY, LISA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 06/22 8:51 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER... that 1. ALL CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES SET FORTH IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ARE STRICKEN. 2. ALL CLAIMS FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF SET FORTH IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ARE STRICKEN. SO STIPULATED: APPROVED BY THE COURT:. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 6/21/2017. 6/22/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 06/20 12:20 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/26/2017 09:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 6/19/2017. 6/20/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) Modified on 6/20/2017 (sg, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 06/20 12:46 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/26/2017 09:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. (sg, ) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 06/19 12:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. Initial Telephone Conference regarding Settlement held on 6/19/2017. (sg, ) Modified on 6/19/2017 (lisad, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 06/07 2:34 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER... that 1. THE DEFENDANT IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL JUNE 23, 2017 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.... APPROVED BY THE COURT:. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 6/7/2017. 6/7/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Disclosure
Tue 05/30 4:00 PM
Disclosure with Certificate of Service by TREDYFFRIN/ EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT.(CONNOR, JOSEPH) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 05/30 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING SETTLEMENT SET FOR 6/19/2017 09:15 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. (CHAMBERS PH. 267-299-7790)(dp, ) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 05/26 11:19 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER that ALL DISCOVERY DUE BY FEBRUARY 23, 2018; PLAINTIFF'S REPORTS DUE JANUARY 26, 2018; DEFENDANT'S REPORTS DUE FEBRUARY 9, 2018; DEPOSITIONS OF ALL EXPERTS MUST BE COMPLETED BY FEBRUARY 23, 2018 AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY MARCH 9, 2018.... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/25/2017. 5/26/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF(mo, ) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
discov
Disclosure
Thu 05/25 2:33 PM
Disclosure by JANE DOE.(WOODY, DENNIS) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
discov
Discovery Plan
Fri 05/19 2:20 PM
Discovery Plan by JANE DOE.(WOODY, DENNIS) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/26 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LISA A. CAULEY on behalf of TREDYFFRIN/ EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(CAULEY, LISA) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/26 9:52 AM
ORDER that A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MAY 23, 2017 AT 02:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/26/2017. 4/26/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH P. CONNOR on behalf of TREDYFFRIN/ EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(CONNOR, JOSEPH) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/17 4:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANE DOE. TREDYFFRIN/ EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 4/11/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (WOODY, DENNIS) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
31
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/10 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT against TREDYFFRIN/ EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 157746.), filed by JANE DOE.(jwl, ) |
|
Att: 1 36 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/10 9:35 AM
Summons Issued as to TREDYFFRIN/ EASTTOWN SCHOOL DISTRICT. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/10/17 (jwl, ) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 04/10 9:36 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JANE DOE. (jwl, ) |