Vincent John Bazemore Jr. v. Cynthia Entzel
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00667 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
judgmentCV
Judgment
Thu 07/26 11:27 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, in favor of Cynthia Entzel against Vincent John Bazemore, Jr Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations,14 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the Petition is denied and this action is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou) |
|
14 | 14
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
Thu 07/26 11:24 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that respondent's Motion to Dismiss (docket no. 10) is granted, and Judgment be entered denying the Petition and dismissing this action with prejudice. (See document for details.)13 (sbou) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Tue 03/13 3:44 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE issued by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that the District Court issue an Order: (1) approving and accepting this Report and Recommendation; (2) granting respondents Motion to Dismiss (docket no. 10); and (3) directing that Judgment be entered denying the Petition and dismissing this action with prejudice. (es) |
|
12 | 12
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Tue 03/13 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Objections to R&R due by 4/2/2018 (es) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
10
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/08 10:10 AM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Within 30 days of the date of this order, or by October 9, 2017,plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint to attempt to cure thedeficiencies discussed (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Rights Complaint Form | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 06/27 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 2241; DECLARATION OF WERNER GUTH; EXHIBITS filed by Respondent Cynthia Entzel. (Lara, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration EXHIBITS & CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Extend Time to File 28:2241/2254
Thu 06/15 10:48 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting8 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time. The date by which Respondent must respond to the petition in the above-entitled case is extended from June 13, 2017, to June 27, 2017. (kca) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extend Time to File 28:2241/2254
Mon 06/12 12:07 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to file 28:2241 petition to 6/27/2017 filed by Respondent Cynthia Entzel. (Lara, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA
Wed 05/31 7:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney Scott Lara on behalf of Respondent Cynthia Entzel. (Attorney Scott Michael Lara added to party Cynthia Entzel(pty:res))(Lara, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 05/30 4:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order to Show Cause Re Filing of Notice of Appearance. Accordingly, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, that is, by June 13, 2017, respondent is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why respondent should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with a court order (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P)
Thu 05/18 4:49 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting4 REQUEST by Vincent John Bazemore for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. (kca) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)
Tue 05/16 4:39 PM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by petitioner Vincent John Bazemore, Jr. (twdb) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition
Mon 04/17 3:55 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (kca) |
|
Att: 1 Petition | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Mon 04/10 9:07 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa) (esa) |
|
Att: 1 (4/10/2017) CV-111 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241)
Mon 04/10 9:06 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, (Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Vincent John Bazemore, Jr. (esa) |