Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust v. DiBella Masonry, Inc et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | John C Coughenour |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00550 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 07, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
DiBella Cattle Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
DiBella Construction, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DiBella Enterprises, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DiBella Masonry, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-25
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 07/05 10:54 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice. (PM) |
||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case)
Mon 07/03 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust (Lash, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing
Tue 05/30 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders the Status Conference RESET from 7/11/2017 to 7/25/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/18 11:17 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust (Lash, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)
Wed 04/12 8:01 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) |
|
3 | 3
misc
JCC-Set Status Conference
Wed 04/12 8:00 AM
MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 7/11/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/11 10:55 AM
Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) DiBella Cattle Company LLC, DiBella Construction Inc, DiBella Enterprises Inc, DiBella Masonry Inc.(DJ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/11 10:45 AM
U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (DJ) |
||
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Tue 04/11 10:58 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, (if applicable), Plaintiff(s) Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/18/2017. (DJ) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/10 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Douglas M. Lash added to party Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust(pty:pla), filed by Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust.(Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |