Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust v. Crosby Restoration Inc et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00551 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 07, 2017 2:43 AM PDT |
Cross Claimant
Crosby Restoration Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Does 1-25
|
|
Cross Defendant
G.H.B. Construction Services of Washington
|
|
Defendant
Crosby Restoration Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-25
|
|
Defendant
G.H.B. Construction Services of Washington
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Main Street Masonry Restoration
Terminated: 05/23/2017
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Judgment by Court
Thu 05/31 8:17 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT: Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust against Defendant Main Street Masonry Restoration in the amount of $17,231.25, which is the remaining withdrawal liability owed by Crosby Restoration, Inc. to the Trust. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the highest allowable interest rate per annum from date of entry of Default Judgment, until paid. (VE) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 05/30 1:52 PM
ORDER of Default Judgment to be Entered Against Defendant Main Street Masonry Restoration re Plaintiff's32 Motion for Default Judgment signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Declaration
Mon 04/09 11:22 AM
DECLARATION of Douglas M. Lash filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust re32 MOTION for Default Judgment(Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
33 | 33
respm
Declaration
Mon 04/09 11:20 AM
DECLARATION of Paul Sangalang filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust re32 MOTION for Default Judgment(Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
32 | 32
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 04/09 11:20 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust. Noting Date 4/9/2018, (Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 03/26 10:32 AM
Pursuant to the parties'31 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Crosby Restoration and GHB , Defendants Crosby Restoration, Inc. and GHB Construction Services of Washington are dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney fees to any parties. (VE) |
||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Fri 03/23 10:41 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants Crosby Restoration and GHB by parties (Lash, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/15 2:01 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crosby Restoration Inc. (Hecker, Jordan) |
|
29 | 29
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/15 1:55 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by G.H.B. Construction Services of Washington (Weitz, Scott) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/12 1:54 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust (Lash, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
RAJ Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
Thu 02/08 1:55 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 3 days. BENCH TRIAL is set for 2/4/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 3/7/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/8/2018, Discovery completed by 10/9/2018, Dispositive motions due by 11/6/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/7/2019, Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2019, Trial briefs, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 1/28/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Thu 02/08 1:49 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust, Defendant Crosby Restoration, Inc., and Defendant GHB Construction Services of Washington must file Corporate Disclosure Statements by 2/15/2018. (VE) |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Joint Status Report
Wed 02/07 2:40 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3. (Lash, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Wed 01/10 10:36 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/24/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/31/2018, Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2018, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default
Tue 01/02 9:38 AM
CLERK'S ORDER on20 MOTION for Default Against Main Street Masonry Restoration . Defendant Main Street Masonry Restoration is in default. (VE) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 12/22 10:03 AM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by G.H.B. Construction Services of Washington.(Weitz, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Tue 12/19 2:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on George H. Brewer Jr. on 12/8/2017, filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust. (Lash, Douglas) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Declaration
Tue 12/19 9:32 AM
DECLARATION of Douglas M. Lash filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust re20 MOTION for Default Against Main Street Masonry Restoration(Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
20 | 20
motion
Default
Tue 12/19 9:31 AM
MOTION for Default Against Main Street Masonry Restoration , filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust. Noting Date 12/19/2017, (Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 12/07 9:28 AM
Set Deadline: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff must provide proof of service of its Amended Complaint upon Defendant GHB Construction Services of Washington no later than 1/8/2018. Plaintiff must move for an order of default against Defendant Main Street Masonry Restoration by 1/8/2018, or set forth by that date why entry of default is not appropriate at this time. (VE) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s)
Wed 12/06 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Does 1-25, filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust. (Lash, Douglas) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 12/06 8:26 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust(Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 12/04 12:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by 12/8/2017 why Defendants GHB Construction Services of Washington, Main Street Masonry Restoration, and Does 1-25 should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (VE) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/05 4:28 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Crosby Restoration Inc.. (Hecker, Jordan) |
|
15 | 15
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/05 4:16 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Crosby Restoration Inc.. (Hecker, Jordan) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/22 10:53 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Crosby Restoration Inc. (Main Document), G.H.B. Construction Services of Washington, Main Street Masonry Restoration. (TH) |
|
Att: 1 Summons issued as to dft. G.H.B. Construction Services of Washington, | ||
Att: 2 Summons issued as to dft. Mainstreet Masonry Restoration | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 08/21 11:30 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re12 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust(Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/17 12:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust.(Lash, Douglas) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice-Other
Thu 08/17 12:13 PM
NOTICE to Clerk re Filing First Amended Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust.(Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice re Lack of Proper Signature
Fri 06/23 1:10 PM
NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, filed on 6/22/2017 was improperly signed by John T. Yip. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." (RS) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Thu 06/22 4:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, of Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust , CROSSCLAIM of Crosby Restoration, Inc. against defendant Does 1-25, G.H.B. Construction Services of Washington by Crosby Restoration Inc..(Hecker, Jordan) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/07 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jordan M Hecker on behalf of Defendant Crosby Restoration Inc.. (Hecker, Jordan) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s)
Tue 05/23 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Main Street Masonry Restoration, filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust. (Lash, Douglas) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
1 - Order
Mon 04/17 11:13 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 04/14 11:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A Jones for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to RAJ. (KMP) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges
Wed 04/12 9:47 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Joint Status Report due by 5/24/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/10/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/17/2017. (KMP) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Consent Letter & Form - Gen Civil
Wed 04/12 9:46 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM. If consent or decline, return the executed form by 5/24/2017. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/11 11:13 AM
Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Crosby Restoration Inc, G.H.B. Construction Services of Washington, Main Street Masonry Restoration.(DJ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/11 11:06 AM
Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (DJ) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/10 12:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Douglas M. Lash added to party Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust(pty:pla), filed by Board of Trustees of the B.A.C. Local No. 1 Washington Pension Trust.(Lash, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |