Woolf v. City of Alliance et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James S Gwin |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00779 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 08, 2017 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of Alliance
470 E. Market Street
Alliance, OH 44601 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott C. Griffith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James L. Hilles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Officers
|
|
Defendant
Tye R. Lauener
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher D. McCord
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shane D. Tallman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William L. Woolf
|
Represented By
|
1. | Excessive force lawsuit filed against Alliance police officer after using taser (cantonrep.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/19/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 11/17 3:37 PM
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/17/17. Upon the parties' representation that all issues have been resolved, the docket is marked as settled and dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction as set forth in this entry. (D,MA) |
|
22 | 22
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 11/17 3:33 PM
Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 11/17/17. (Court Reporter: L. Boardman; Time: 1 hr. 2 min.) (D,MA) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to excuse
Wed 11/15 11:17 AM
Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/15/17 granting defendants' motion to excuse personal attendance of Captain James L. Hilles, Patrolman Tye R. Lauener, and Patrolman Shane D. Tallman and defendant's insurance adjuster from the 11/17/17 status conference. Defendant's insurance adjuster shall attend by phone. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information by email. (D,MA) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Excuse
Tue 11/14 9:33 AM
Motion to excuse Attendance of Captain James L. Hilles, Patrolman Tye R. Lauener, And Patrolman Shane D. Tallman, And The In-Person Attendance of Insurance Adjuster filed by City of Alliance, Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, Shane D. Tallman. (Smearman, R.) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice
Mon 11/13 4:06 PM
Defendants' Notice of Filing Deposition Transcripts filed by City of Alliance, Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, Shane D. Tallman.(Smearman, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Deposition Transcript of Plaintiff, William L. Woolf, | ||
Att: 2 Deposition Transcript of Defendant, Christopher D. McCord, | ||
Att: 3 Deposition Transcript of Defendant, Shane D. Tallman, | ||
Att: 4 Deposition Transcript of Defendant, Tye R. Lauener, | ||
Att: 5 Deposition Transcript of Defendant, James L. Hilles, | ||
Att: 6 Deposition Transcript of Defendant, Scott C. Griffith | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 11/13 4:01 PM
Motion for summary judgment filed by City of Alliance, Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, Shane D. Tallman.(Smearman, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Samuel D. Faulkner, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Christopher McCord, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Affidavit of R. Eric Smearman, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of James L. Hilles, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Affidavit of Shane D. Tallman | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Protective Order
Fri 10/13 3:53 PM
Joint Motion for protective order filed by City of Alliance, Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, Shane D. Tallman.(Smearman, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Protective Order | ||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Stipulation & Order
Wed 09/06 3:23 PM
Stipulation & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/6/17 approving the parties' stipulation for defendants City of Alliance and Christopher McCord to respond to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents by 9/27/17. (D,MA) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Stipulation
Mon 08/28 1:56 PM
Proposed Stipulation For Leave to Plead and Journal Entry filed by City of Alliance, Christopher D. McCord. (Smearman, R.) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Thu 07/20 9:57 AM
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/20/17 that plaintiff shall identify experts by 9/18/17 and defendants shall identify experts by 10/2/17. (D,MA) |
|
14 | 14
order
Case Management Conference Plan/Order
Thu 07/20 9:44 AM
Case Management Conference Plan/Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/20/17. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be joined and pleadings amended by 7/19/17. Dispositive motions to be filed by 11/13/17 with responses due 11/27/17 and replies due 12/4/17. All discovery to be completed by 1/29/18. Status conference set for 11/17/17 at 12:00 p.m., and final pretrial conference set for 2/13/18 at 12:00 p.m., both in Chambers 18A. Jury trial is assigned on a two-week standby basis beginning 2/20/18 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (D,MA) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Case Management Conference
Thu 07/20 9:33 AM
Minutes of case management conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 7/19/17. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 1 hr.) (D,MA) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to excuse appearance
Fri 07/14 10:25 AM
Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/14/17 granting defendants' motion to excuse personal attendance of Captain James L. Hilles, Patrolman Tye R. Lauener, Patrolman Shane D. Tallman, and defendants' insurance adjuster Senior Claims Specialist Mike McGuff from the 7/19/17 case management conference. Mr. McGuff shall attend by phone. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information by email. (D,MA) |
||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses
Thu 07/13 6:01 PM
Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murray, Brian) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Thu 07/13 4:44 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murray, Brian) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Excuse Appearance
Thu 07/13 10:40 AM
Motion to excuse appearance and The In-Person Attendance of Insurance Adjuster filed by City of Alliance, Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, Shane D. Tallman. (Dearnbarger, Kallen) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/07 10:12 AM
Defendants' Joint Answer to1 Complaint, filed by City of Alliance, Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, Shane D. Tallman. (Dearnbarger, Kallen) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Fri 05/19 10:19 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that the case management conference previously set for 7/5/17 is reset due to a scheduling conflict on the Court's calendar. Conference reset to 7/19/17 at 12:00 p.m., Chambers 18A. (D,MA) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 05/10 11:15 AM
Attorney Appearance by R. Eric Smearman filed by on behalf of City of Alliance, Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, Shane D. Tallman. (Smearman, R.) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Tue 05/09 11:56 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/9/17 setting a conference for 7/5/17 at 12:00 p.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (D,MA) |
|
6 | 6
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy
Tue 05/09 11:37 AM
Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 5/9/17. (D,MA) |
|
5 | 5
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 05/09 10:29 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon City of Alliance on 4/17/2017, filed on behalf of William L. Woolf. Related document(s)2 . (R,Sh) |
|
order
Stipulation & Order
Tue 05/09 11:35 AM
Stipulation & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/9/17 approving the parties' proposed stipulation for leave until 6/7/17 for defendants to file an answer to the complaint. The Court requires the filing of an answer. (D,MA) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Stipulation
Mon 05/08 10:14 AM
Proposed Stipulation for Leave to Plead and Journal Entry filed by City of Alliance, Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, Shane D. Tallman. (Dearnbarger, Kallen) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 04/18 1:52 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, Shane D. Tallman, no date of service indicated on green card, filed on behalf of William L. Woolf. Related document(s)2 . (R,Sh) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
oth_evt
Service by Clerk
Thu 04/13 2:36 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to City of Alliance Receipt # 70160340000045421155, Scott C. Griffith Receipt # 70160340000045421193, James L. Hilles Receipt # 70160340000045421179, Tye R. Lauener Receipt # 70160340000045421186, Christopher D. McCord Receipt # 70160340000045421162, Shane D. Tallman Receipt # 70160340000045421209, placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (S,SR) |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Wed 04/12 9:22 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon City of Alliance, Scott C. Griffith, James L. Hilles, Tye R. Lauener, Christopher D. McCord, and Shane D. Tallman. (T,Je) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 04/12 8:51 AM
Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (T,Je) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/12 8:52 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (T,Je) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
44
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/11 8:45 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8109654.. Filed by William L Woolf. (Murray, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons City of Alliance, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Christopher McCord, | ||
Att: 4 Summons James Hilles, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Tye Lauener, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Shane Tallman, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Scott Griffith |