OrionClick LLC v. Kelvin Inocent et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00644 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 07, 2017 1:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kelvin Inocent
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yma Inocent
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Iron Peak Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Mark Conrad
Conrad & Metlitzky Four Embarcadero Center Suite 1400
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
|
Plaintiff
OrionClick LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago |
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/30 10:41 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for All Purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/30/17. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 06/30 9:11 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Joint Consent to Magistrate Judge & [Proposed] Order filed by OrionClick LLC. (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Anne Sanderson as Lead Counsel (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 6/19/2017) |
|
28 | 28
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/19 8:17 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/16/2017. Hearing on Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 9/8/2017. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/9/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/22/2017. Designation of Experts due by 1/14/2018. Rebuttal Reports due by 2/16/2018. Jury Selection set for 8/1/2018 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 8/6/2018 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Dispositive Motion Placeholder set for 4/27/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion to Amend Pleadings Placeholder set for 9/8/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.Total Time in Court 12 minutes. Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2017) Modified on 6/19/2017 (jjoS, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 06/19 8:24 AM
Set/Reset Hearing re28 Case Management Conference: Motion to Amend Pleadings Placeholder set for 9/8/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation
Fri 06/09 11:50 AM
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 24 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Fri 06/09 9:55 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by OrionClick LLC. (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 6/9/2017) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 06/02 12:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Kelvin Inocent, Yma Inocent, Iron Peak Holdings, LLC (Townsend, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/2/2017) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
Thu 06/01 2:35 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by OrionClick LLC filed by OrionClick LLC. (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 6/1/2017) |
|
23 | 23
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 06/01 8:43 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Townsend, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/1/2017) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Wed 05/31 2:29 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff OrionClick LLC (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 5/31/2017) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice
Tue 05/30 2:56 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Thu 05/18 2:46 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Alternative Service on Defendants Kelvin Inocent and Yma Inocent (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 5/18/2017) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 05/15 9:41 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE. Show Cause Response due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S White on 5/15/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/09 11:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byKelvin Inocent, Yma Inocent, Iron Peak Holdings, LLC. (Townsend, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/9/2017) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/28 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Griffith Townsend (Townsend, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/28/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/13 9:43 AM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/13/17. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/11 10:33 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/11/17.(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017) | |
13 | 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION for Alternative Service on Defendants Kelvin Inocent and Yma Inocent filed by OrionClick LLC, ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Objections due by 4/24/2017. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/10/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017) | |
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OrionClick LLC re10 MOTION for Alternative Service on Defendants Kelvin Inocent and Yma Inocent ,11 Declaration in Support,, (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 3/22/2017) | |
11 | 11 Declaration of Virginia Sanderson in Support of10 MOTION for Alternative Service on Defendants Kelvin Inocent and Yma Inocent filed byOrionClick LLC. (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 3/22/2017) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Take Down Notice to Vultr, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Email from Domains By Proxy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Formation for Iron Peak, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - UPS Store Screenshot, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - UPS Store Screenshot, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Affidavits of Due Diligence, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Non-Service Reports | ||
10 | 10 MOTION for Alternative Service on Defendants Kelvin Inocent and Yma Inocent filed by OrionClick LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 4/5/2017. Replies due by 4/12/2017.(Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 3/22/2017) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OrionClick LLC. Iron Peak Holdings, LLC served on 2/13/2017, answer due 3/6/2017. (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 3/7/2017) | |
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by OrionClick LLC.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/23/2017) | |
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 Summons Issued as to Kelvin Inocent, Yma Inocent, Iron Peak Holdings, LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017) | |
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) | |
5 | 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE by OrionClick LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 2/8/2017) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by OrionClick LLC (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 2/8/2017) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 2/8/2017) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Kelvin Inocent, Yma Inocent, Iron Peak Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11141333.). Filed byOrionClick LLC.(Sanderson, Virginia) (Filed on 2/8/2017) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |