Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Global Equity Management (SA) Pty Ltd
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02053 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 09, 2017 1:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Global Equity Management (SA) Pty Ltd
|
|
Plaintiff
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94110 |
Represented By
|
1. | Judge: EFF's "Stupid Patent of the Month" clearly protected by Constitution (arstechnica.com) |
Submitted Thu 11/23/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago |
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
oth_evt
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 11/30 12:45 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Electronic Frontier Foundation against Global Equity Management (SA) Pty Ltd. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
27
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Fri 11/17 12:51 PM
ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER ASSIGNED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 14 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 27 Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter; granting 29 Administrative Motion to Augment the Record. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 11/16 2:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2017 re 27 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2017) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/16 12:35 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to27 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor , San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default
Mon 11/13 5:23 PM
Clerk's Notice of ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant Global Equity Management (SA) Pty Ltd. (tnS) (Filed on 11/13/2017) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Entry of Default
Fri 11/10 8:33 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation.(Kelley, Matthew) (Filed on 11/10/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew E. Kelley, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Entry of Default | ||
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/08 5:13 PM
ORDER TO FILE ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 10/10 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew Edward Kelley (Kelley, Matthew) (Filed on 10/10/2017) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 10/10 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Ashley Ivy Kissinger (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 10/10/2017) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 10/05 1:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re27 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge ,28 Request for Judicial Notice,29 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Augment the Record re27 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 10/5/2017) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Errata
Thu 10/05 1:50 PM
ERRATA re27 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge ,28 Request for Judicial Notice,29 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Augment the Record re27 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 10/5/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 10/04 4:50 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Augment the Record re27 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Responses due by 10/10/2017.(Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 10/4/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of K. Opsahl, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of B. Weed | ||
28 | 28
oth_sup
Request for Judicial Notice
Wed 10/04 4:47 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re27 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 10/4/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I | ||
27 | 27
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/04 4:44 PM
MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/18/2017. Replies due by 10/25/2017.(Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 10/4/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 10/05 8:12 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to27 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor , San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 09/22 3:31 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District | ||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/21 11:37 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/17.(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 09/20 11:40 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Report and Recommendations Order Reassigning Case
Wed 09/20 10:10 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 MOTION for Default Judgment & ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Objections due by 10/4/2017. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/20/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
oth_sup
Supplemental Brief
Tue 09/12 3:36 PM
Supplemental Brief re14 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Global Equity Management (SA) Pty Ltd. ,17 Terminate Hearings, Order filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Kelley, Matthew) (Filed on 9/12/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Paul Svilans, Esq. | ||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/01 2:07 PM
ORDER re 20 Notice (Other) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/1/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/31 5:30 PM
NOTICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re17 Terminate Hearings, Order Requesting Clarification of the Court's Order (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 8/31/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/30 11:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION re 18 Letter Brief filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/30/2017. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) |
|
18 | 18
oth_sup
Letter Brief
Wed 08/30 9:59 AM
Letter Brief re17 Terminate Hearings, Order Requesting a Brief Extension of Time filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 8/30/2017) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Order
Mon 08/28 12:25 PM
ORDER Vacating September 7, 2017 Hearing re: 14 MOTION for Default Judgment; ORDER for Supplemental Briefing. Supplemental brief due 9/5/2017. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/28/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/16 3:26 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 07/20 1:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re12 Affidavit of Service,,10 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options,8 Summons Returned Executed,7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge,11 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d),9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11488254.),13 Terminate Hearings, Status Report Order (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 7/20/2017) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment - by the Court
Thu 07/20 1:39 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Global Equity Management (SA) Pty Ltd. filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 8/3/2017. Replies due by 8/10/2017.(Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 7/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Request for Judicial Notice with Declaration and Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Memorandum Opinion & Order with Appendices | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Status Report Order
Fri 07/07 9:41 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The July 13, 2017 Case Management Conference is VACATED. Status Report due by 7/20/2017. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/30 1:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Hague Service Convention Notice, Hague Service Convention Summary, Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Certification of Interested Entities, Order Setting Initial Case Management, ECF Registration Information, Notice of Assignment of Case, Consenting to Jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, Discovery Standing Order, Civil Standing Order, Contents of Joint Case Management Statement, Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction AMENDED served on Mobin - United Accountant Group on May 2, 2017, filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
adr
Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
Thu 06/22 2:18 PM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 6/22/2017) |
|
10 | 10
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 06/22 2:17 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 6/22/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/21 10:07 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11488254.) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation.(Kelley, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/08 11:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Global Equity Management (SA) Pty Ltd served on 5/2/2017, answer due 5/23/2017. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 6/8/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/26 12:46 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation.. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 4/26/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/13 12:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Global Equity Management (SA) Pty Ltd. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/13 11:57 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/13 6:23 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 04/12 3:48 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/12 3:46 PM
Proposed Summons. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/12 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Global Equity Management (SA) Pty Ltd ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11310289.). Filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation.(Kissinger, Ashley) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 22 Civil Cover Sheet |