Tiner v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Blake |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00942 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 5:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kandice M Tiner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
699 | 699
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 08/08 2:22 PM
MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING 4546 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Smith & Nephew Inc., Kandice M Tiner (CCB-17-942) and Kandice M Tiner terminated. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/31/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-00942-CCB(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
698 | 698
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/28 9:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-00942-CC |