Moore v. McHogoff et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | James K Bredar |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01025 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Defendant
Anderson
|
|
Defendant
Dice
|
|
Defendant
McHogoff
|
|
Defendant
Miller
|
|
Interested Party
Office of the Attorney General
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Gary Moore
|
GPO
Apr 26 2018
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/25/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-04-26-2018) |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 04/26 10:58 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Dismiss; Judgment is entered for Defendant Anderson and against Plaintiff; dismissing complaint against defendants McHogoff, Miller, and Dice. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/26/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-04 26-2018 |
|
23 | 23
9
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Thu 04/26 10:53 AM
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/25/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-04 26-2018 |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 04/23 2:09 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Substitution of Counsel and Motion to Withdrawal by Anderson(Lane Weber, Stephanie) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 10/06 4:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Gary Moore.(ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Rule 12/56
Mon 09/25 1:04 PM
Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Robert Gary Moore (ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Fri 09/22 4:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Anderson(Dernoga, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Documents, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 09/22 3:59 PM
ORDER granting17 Third Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/21/2017. (c/m 9/22/17) (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 09/20 5:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to and including September 22, 2017 by Anderson(Dernoga, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
corresp
Miscellaneous
Mon 09/11 12:44 PM
Correspondence received from Robert Gary Moore re: Request for Order to Show Cause. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/31 11:44 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by September 20, 2017.. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/30/2017. (c/m 8/31/2017) (jah, Deputy Clerk) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/30 12:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to and including September 20, 2017 by Anderson(Dernoga, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response
Fri 07/21 12:28 PM
RESPONSE re12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Robert Gary Moore.(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/12 7:22 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to and including 8/9/2017. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 7/11/2017. (c/m 7/12/17) (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/10 4:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Anderson, Office of the Attorney General.(Dernoga, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Paid
Thu 06/29 1:09 PM
Filing fee: $ 9.97, receipt number 14637098808 (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Supplemental
Wed 06/28 11:53 AM
Supplemental to1 Complaint filed by Robert Gary Moore(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E Dernoga on behalf of Office of the Attorney General (Dernoga, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response
Wed 06/07 1:47 PM
RESPONSE re7 Order filed by Robert Gary Moore.(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Thu 05/25 4:23 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff 21 days to inform the court how he wishes to proceed. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/25/2017. (c/m 5/26/17)(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Correspondence
Mon 05/22 2:47 PM
Correspondence from Litigation Coordinator re: Accepting/Refusing Service(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order and Institutional Coordinator Letter Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/10 3:50 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re1 Complaint filed by Robert Gary Moore ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments ; granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/10/2017. (c/m 5/10/17) (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Institutional Coordinator Letter | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 05/09 2:19 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 04/25 9:26 AM
ORDER directing Fiscal Administrator to file a certificate that indicates the average monthly balance in and deposits to Plaintiff's account for the six-month period immediately prior to April 13, 2017 and the initial partial filing fee. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/24/2017. (c/m 4/25/17)(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/13 2:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Gary Moore(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/13 2:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Anderson, Dice, McHogoff filed by Robert Gary Moore.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |