Tony Vitrano Company v. Masser's Produce et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | J Frederick Motz |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01027 |
Nature of Suit | 891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts |
Cause | 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jeffrey Masser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Masser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Timothy Masser
|
|
Defendant
Masser's Produce
|
|
Plaintiff
Tony Vitrano Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward G. Rahill & Sons, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/25 11:47 AM
ORDER approving24 Stipulation of Settlement filed by Edward G. Rahill & Sons, Inc., Tony Vitrano Company. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/24/2018. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 01/25 12:30 PM
Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to case. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Tue 01/23 4:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Cancelling Settlement Conference currently scheduled for January 31, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/23/2018. (daws, Chambers) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Tue 01/23 1:11 PM
STIPULATION of Settlement by Edward G. Rahill & Sons, Inc., Tony Vitrano Company(Surbey, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 01/18 2:10 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Timothy Masser, Masser's Produce (c/m 1/18/2018 krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Default - Clerk's Entry of
Tue 10/17 4:25 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Masser's Produce and Timothy Masser by Edward G. Rahill & Sons, Inc., Tony Vitrano Company(Surbey, Blake) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 10/02 10:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Vitrano Company, Edward G. Rahill & Sons, Inc.. Timothy Masser served on 9/13/2017, answer due 10/4/2017; Masser's Produce served on 9/13/2017, answer due 10/4/2017.(Surbey, Blake) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 09/14 8:54 AM
QC NOTICE:19 Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Jeffrey Masser, Michael Masser was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile using the event "Answer to Complaint." It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/11 3:01 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint, by Jeffrey Masser, Michael Masser. (Walters, Laura) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/29 9:55 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Masser, Michael Masser, Timothy Masser, Masser's Produce, filed by Tony Vitrano Company, Edward G. Rahill & Sons, Inc..(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Redline, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 08/29 9:29 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/28/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Thu 08/10 10:46 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/10/2017. (daws, Chambers) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/07 3:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint of Defendants Jeffrey Masser & Michael Masser by Michael Masser.(Walters, Laura) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 08/01 9:13 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, to add Edward G. Rahll & Sons, Inc. as party plaintiff by Tony Vitrano Company(Surbey, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A_Proposed Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B_Redline, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/26 11:29 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/26/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/26 10:58 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for Settlement. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/26/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 08/10 12:31 PM
Scheduling Conference held on 7/25/2017 before Judge J. Frederick Motz.(Court Reporter: None) (mds, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 07/12 2:06 PM
ORDER re conference call and schedule of case. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/11/2017.(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Tentative Scheduling Order and Letter re call-in hour program | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 05/31 4:06 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tony Vitrano Company.(Surbey, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1_NSF Checks | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 05/17 2:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jeffrey Masser, Michael Masser(Walters, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 1:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Vitrano Company. Timothy Masser served on 4/26/2017, answer due 5/17/2017.(Surbey, Blake) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 1:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Vitrano Company. Michael Masser served on 4/26/2017, answer due 5/17/2017.(Surbey, Blake) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 1:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Vitrano Company. Masser's Produce served on 4/26/2017, answer due 5/17/2017.(Surbey, Blake) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Vitrano Company. Jeffrey Masser served on 4/26/2017, answer due 5/17/2017.(Surbey, Blake) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/17 10:36 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Jeffrey Masser, Michael Masser, Timothy Masser, Masser's Produce.(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/13 3:45 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tony Vitrano Company (Surbey, Blake) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/13 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Louis W Diess, III on behalf of Tony Vitrano Company (Diess, Louis) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/13 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Masser, Michael Masser, Timothy Masser, Masser's Produce ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6606952.), filed by Tony Vitrano Company.(Surbey, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons_Jeffrey Masser, | ||
Att: 6 Summons_Masser's Produce, | ||
Att: 7 Summons_Michael Masser, | ||
Att: 8 Summons_Timothy Masser |