United States of America v. Sangarie
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Paul W Grimm |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01019 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7407 IRS: Action to enjoin income tax preparers |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Mohamed Babar Sangarie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment - Consent
Tue 09/05 1:24 PM
JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/1/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Mon 08/28 10:28 AM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by United States of America(Kumar, Nishant) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Injunction | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Tue 07/18 11:12 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER thanking the parties for their joint status report16 and directing them to file another joint status report by August 21, 2017 if they have not resolved this action by then. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/18/17. (Grimm, Paul) (lyb) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Mon 07/17 1:01 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Mohamed Babar Sangarie(De Jong, David) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/26 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Samuel De Jong on behalf of Mohamed Babar Sangarie (De Jong, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Wed 06/21 10:21 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER memorializing today's conference call. A joint status report is due July 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/21/17. (Grimm, Paul) (lyb) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 06/21 10:14 AM
Status Conference held on 6/21/2017 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ats, Chambers) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
corresp
Miscellaneous
Wed 06/14 3:03 PM
Correspondence re: Statement Regarding Non-Monetary Relief Sought (Kumar, Nishant) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Mon 06/05 2:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on June 21, 2017 at 10:00a.m AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/5/2017. (ats, Chambers) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 06/05 1:29 PM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/5/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/05 1:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/13/2017. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/5/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 11:37 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mohamed Babar Sangarie (McInturff, Elizabeth) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/24 11:34 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Mohamed Babar Sangarie.(McInturff, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/16 9:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mohamed Babar Sangarie served on 5/3/2017, answer due 5/24/2017.(Kumar, Nishant) |
|
5 | 5
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 05/16 9:33 AM
QC NOTICE:4 Affidavit of Service filed by United States of America was filed incorrectly. **Please refile using the correct event, Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 05/15 3:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for COMPLAINT and SUMMONS served on MOHAMED BABAR SANGARIE on 5/3/2017, filed by United States of America.(Kumar, Nishant) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Wed 04/19 11:39 AM
LETTER ORDER regarding the filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/19/2017. (c/m 4/19/2017 aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/13 4:12 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Mohamed Babar Sangarie.(ah4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/13 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTION against Mohamed Babar Sangarie, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Kumar, Nishant) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |