Robbins v. City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02229 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 5:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dana Gerendasi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Education of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Diane Triunfo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katie McGillicaddy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maureen Ryan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Robbins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 06/02 10:56 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT that Plaintiff's complaint is deemed amended to exclude her claim for violation of her federal constitutional rights; that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claim, and those claims are dismissed without prejudice to pursuit in state court, for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on 6/1/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
11
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 05/24 10:19 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 5/19/17 that Plaintiffs complaint is deemed amended to exclude her claim for violation of her federal constitutional rights. Because this case is in an early stage, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs state law claims, and for the reasons set forth above, those claims are dismissed without prejudice to pursuit in state court. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/19/017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 05/16 8:22 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference and request for stay of discovery filed by Janice Robbins. (Weinstein, Jay) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 05/03 12:41 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference and request for stay of discovery by City of New York, Dana Gerendasi, Department of Education of the City of New York, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene of the City of New York, Diane Triunfo, Katie McGillicaddy, Maureen Ryan. (Grushka, Leora) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 05/03 9:09 AM
Reset Hearings Time: Due to a change in the Court's schedule, the time of the Initial Conference set for 5/5/2017 will be held in Chambers 704 South at 9:15 AM. (Clarke, Melonie) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Wed 05/03 7:23 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on9 Motion for pre-motion conference and request for stay of discovery. The pre-motion conference is waived, and defendants' letter is deemed to constitute their motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's opposition is due 5/17/2017, and defendants' reply is due 5/24/2017. Discovery is stayed and the Initial Status Conference on 5/5/2017 is adjourned pending resolution of the motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/3/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 05/02 2:19 PM
Reset Hearing Time: Initial Status Conference previously set at 2:15 pm on 5/5/2017 is reset to 10:15 am in Chambers 704S. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Fri 04/28 1:18 PM
Letter Joint letter pursuant to Initial Conference Order by City of New York, Dana Gerendasi, Department of Education of the City of New York, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene of the City of New York, Diane Triunfo, Katie McGillicaddy, Maureen Ryan (Grushka, Leora) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/27 5:41 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by City of New York, Dana Gerendasi, Department of Education of the City of New York, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene of the City of New York, Diane Triunfo, Katie McGillicaddy, Maureen Ryan. (Grushka, Leora) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/27 4:54 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by City of New York, Dana Gerendasi, Department of Education of the City of New York, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene of the City of New York, Diane Triunfo, Katie McGillicaddy, Maureen Ryan. (Grushka, Leora) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/27 10:33 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants to 6/19/17. This does not affect the Initial Status Conference previously set, nor the MANDATORY OBLIGATIONS that the parties have in connection with that conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/27/2017. (Cogan, Brian) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/20 4:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Janice Robbins. (Weinstein, Jay) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/14 9:50 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 5/5/2017 at 2:15 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/14/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/13 4:52 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/13 4:51 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/13 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 703216/2017. (Grushka, Leora) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint | ||
misc
Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee
Thu 04/13 1:17 PM
The case of Robbins v. City New York , has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 17-cv-2229 . PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days . Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
misc
Civil Case Filing Fee
Thu 04/13 2:34 PM
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0207-9447994 (Grushka, Leora) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/13 4:50 PM
Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 04/13 5:09 PM
ORDER re1 Notice of Removal filed by defendants. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2), plaintiff is directed to file, within 10 days, an amended complaint that either (a) dismisses the first federal claim, upon which the Court will decline supplemental jurisdiction and remand the case to state court; or (b) meets the pleading standards required for a federal complaint under Ashcroft v. Iqbal , 556 U.S. 662, 678 (2009), and Bell Atlantic Corp. v. Twombly , 550 U.S. 544, 570 (2007), which the current state court complaint does not. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal or remand. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/13/2017. (Cogan, Brian) |