The Gillette Company LLC v. Shnoop.com Corp. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Roslynn R Mauskopf |
Referred: | Peggy Kuo |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02236 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Menachem Grossman
|
|
Defendant
Shnoop.com Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120
Tue 03/06 9:27 AM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Order dismissing case | ||
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/01 8:23 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The stipulation at22 is so ordered. The action is voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii). Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and court costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 3/1/2018. (Taronji, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 02/27 3:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order (corrected cert of service) by The Gillette Company LLC (Davis, Govinda) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 02/27 3:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order by The Gillette Company LLC (Davis, Govinda) |
|
order
1 - Terminate Hearings
Tue 02/27 5:12 PM
ORDER: In light of the Stipulation of Dismissal at22 , the March 1, 2018 initial conference is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/27/2018. (Syed, Sofie) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/23 10:13 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on March 1, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend . Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. Counsel are required to bring to the conference a completed copy of the attached Rule 26(f) Conference Checklist, and to file before the conference a completed copy of the attached proposed Initial Scheduling Order, a pdf-fillable version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-schedo.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/23/2018. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
|
Att: 1 Initial Scheduling Order Form, | ||
Att: 2 Conference Checklist | ||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/19 12:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Menachem Grossman, Shnoop.com Corp.. (Silber, Meyer) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 11/16 11:11 AM
ORDER: The parties' joint request for an extension of time18 is granted. Defendants' answer shall be filed on or before 1/19/2018. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/16/2017. (Wechsler, Simon) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 11/15 10:57 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by The Gillette Company LLC. (Davis, Govinda) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice(Other)
Tue 10/24 12:56 PM
NOTICE by The Gillette Company LLC Notice of Service of Court's October 20, 2017 Order on Defendants (Davis, Govinda) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 12:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Gillette Company LLC. Menachem Grossman served on 7/21/2017, answer due 11/20/2017. (Davis, Govinda) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 12:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Gillette Company LLC. Shnoop.com Corp. served on 7/21/2017, answer due 11/20/2017. (Davis, Govinda) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order to Answer
Fri 10/20 5:53 PM
ORDER: The Court finds that good cause exists to permit Plaintiff to file the proof of service at [13-3], and reminds Plaintiff that proof of service should be filed in a timely manner in the future. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 20, 2017 . Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Defendants and file proof of service of the Order by October 25, 2017 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/20/2017. (Syed, Sofie) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Wed 10/18 7:14 PM
Letter in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause and Plaintiff's Response by Menachem Grossman, Shnoop.com Corp. (Silber, Meyer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
13 | 13
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 10/18 5:23 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by The Gillette Company LLC (Davis, Govinda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Response to Order to Show Cause, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Response to Order to Show Cause, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Response to Order to Show Cause | ||
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 10/12 12:13 PM
Order to Show Cause: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by October 19, 2017 why no affidavit of service has been filed regarding the summons issued on July 12, 2017. Failure to do so may result in a recommendation that this matter be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/12/2017. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 07/12 2:15 PM
Proposed Summons. by The Gillette Company LLC (Davis, Govinda) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 07/12 2:13 PM
Proposed Summons. by The Gillette Company LLC (Davis, Govinda) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 04/21 1:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 4/21/2017. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120
Thu 04/20 3:39 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 complaint | ||
7 | 7
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/20 2:00 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/20 1:57 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice(Other)
Thu 04/20 11:27 AM
NOTICE by The Gillette Company LLC Form AO 120 (Davis, Govinda) |
|
Att: 1 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/20 11:21 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint,, by The Gillette Company LLC (Davis, Govinda) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/20 1:57 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 04/17 2:05 PM
NOTICE The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons. Counsel is directed to forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions including the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Thu 04/13 3:55 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Meyer Y. Silber, Esq. on 04/13/2017 by The Gillette Company LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/13/2017. (Davis, Govinda) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/13 3:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Gillette Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Proctor & Gamble Company for The Gillette Company LLC. (Davis, Govinda) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/13 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9448293 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by The Gillette Company LLC. (Davis, Govinda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver Grossman, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver Shnoop, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Waiver of Service |