Shpontak et al v. Etlis et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kiyo A Matsumoto |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02237 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle ( |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Tobin L Etlis
CONNORS & CONNORS, P.C. 766 Castleton Avenue
Staten Island, NY 10310 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alla Shpontak
LEVITSKY LAW FIRM 3171 Coney Island Avenue, 2nd Floor
Brooklyn, NY 11235 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vasyl V Shpontak
LEVITSKY LAW FIRM 3171 Coney Island Avenue, 2nd Floor
Brooklyn, NY 11235 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K. S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
V. S.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Toyota Lease Trust
Terminated: 07/13/2017
London Fischer LLP 59 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Tue 01/09 9:46 AM
Order Dismissing Parties: That this action be, and the same hereby is, voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, as against Deft Tobin L. Etlis, without costs to any party as against the other. (Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 1/5/2018) (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/05 5:55 PM
STIPULATION So Ordered Stip of Discontinuance by K. S., V. S., Alla Shpontak, Vasyl V Shpontak (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 12/20 2:26 PM
Letter Motion: Amended Letter Requesting Adjournment by K. S., V. S., Alla Shpontak, Vasyl V Shpontak (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 12/20 2:52 PM
ORDER: In light of letter Motion requesting to adjourn conference24 is granted. The in person initial conference scheduled for 12/21/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Bulsara is adjourned sine die. The parties are direct file a letter by 1/9/2018 providing a status report on the case and whether they intend to voluntarily dismiss this action. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/20/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Tue 12/19 11:15 AM
Letter Letter Request for Adjournment by K. S., V. S., Alla Shpontak, Vasyl V Shpontak (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/19 12:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person initial conference will be held at 12:00 PM on 12/21/2017 in Courtroom 324N before Judge Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two (2) days before 12/21/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/19/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 10/18 8:59 AM
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFF VASYL V. SHPONTAK. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/18/2017. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 10/17 11:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tobin L Etlis (DeCarlo, Michael) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 09/01 8:50 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August) |
||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 07/13 6:40 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to Toyota Lease Trust, with prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 6/27/2017. (Barrett, C) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 06/22 3:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal to be "So-Ordered" by Toyota Lease Trust (Aaron, Clifford) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/23 12:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER as to defendant Toyota Lease Trust's6 proposed motion to dismiss and17 the parties' proposed briefing schedule. Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss by June 23, 2017 . Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by July 14, 2017 , and defendant shall file its reply, if any, by July 21, 2017 . Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/23/2017. (Tata, Vivek) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 05/15 6:17 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed Briefing Schedule by K. S., V. S., Alla Shpontak, Vasyl V Shpontak (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Mon 05/15 4:35 PM
Letter Plaintiffs Letter Advising of Conditions to Stip of Discontinuance by K. S., V. S., Alla Shpontak, Vasyl V Shpontak (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 05/12 2:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: Telephonic premotion conference held on May 12, 2017 on defendant Toyota Lease Trust's6 anticipated motion to dismiss. Appearances: Yuriy Yaroslavskiy, Esq., for plaintiffs; Robert Joseph Pfuhler, Esq., for defendant Tobin L. Etlis; and Clifford B. Aaron, Esq., for defendant Toyota Lease Trust. The court ordered that, by close of business on May 15, 2017 , plaintiffs shall file a letter advising the court of whether the parties have agreed to file a stipulation to dismiss defendant Toyota Lease Trust with prejudice and to remand this action. If the parties have not agreed to such a stipulation, plaintiff shall advise the court of a proposed briefing schedule for defendant Toyota Lease Trust's anticipated motion to dismiss. (Tata, Vivek) |
||
Saturday, May 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Redacted Document
Sat 05/06 11:14 AM
REDACTION to1 Notice of Removal, Redacted Verified Summons and Complaint by Alla Shpontak, K.S., Vasyl V Shpontak, V.S.(an infant under the age of 18 by his mother and natural guardian Alla Shpontak) (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) Modified on 5/8/2017 (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Restricting Access
Fri 05/05 3:31 PM
ORDER RESTRICTING ACCESS This document re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Toyota Lease Trust was filed without redaction of certain information as required by the E-Government Act of 2002 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to restrict access to this document. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/5/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/05 7:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting defendant Toyota Lease Trust's11 letter request for a premotion conference. A telephonic premotion conference regarding defendant Toyota Lease Trust's proposed motion to dismiss shall be held on May 12, 2017, at 2:00 P.M. Counsel for defendant Toyota Lease Trust shall coordinate a conference call between all parties to this matter, and dial into the court (718-613-2180) when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/5/2017. (Tata, Vivek) |
||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/03 5:13 PM
STIPULATION Proposed Stipulation of Discontinuance by Alla Shpontak, Kevin Shpontak, Vasyl V Shpontak, Vasyl Shpontak(an infant under the age of 18 by his mother and natural guardian Alla Shpontak) (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Wed 05/03 4:21 PM
Letter Response to May 2, 2017 Letter by Alla Shpontak, Kevin Shpontak, Vasyl V Shpontak, Vasyl Shpontak(an infant under the age of 18 by his mother and natural guardian Alla Shpontak) (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 05/02 12:21 PM
Letter Renewing Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Toyota Lease Trust (Weiss, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 04/28 9:55 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Upon request and consent of the parties, the conference scheduled for May 4, 2017, is adjourned without date. Plaintiffs shall file their proposed stipulation of discontinuance against defendant Toyota Lease Trust by May 3, 2017 . Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 4/28/2017. (Tata, Vivek) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Wed 04/26 3:31 PM
Letter Answer to Defendant's Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Alla Shpontak, Kevin Shpontak, Vasyl V Shpontak, Vasyl Shpontak(an infant under the age of 18 by his mother and natural guardian Alla Shpontak) (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 04/26 2:45 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for May 4, 2017 on consent by Toyota Lease Trust. (Weiss, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 04/25 7:04 PM
ORDER granting defendant's6 letter request for a pre-motion conference. A telephonic pre-motion conference will be held on May 4, 2017 at 3:00p.m. Counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and dial into 718-613-2180 once all parties are on the line. Per chambers practice, counsel for plaintiffs shall respond by letter to the request for pre-motion conference by April 28, 2017. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on April 25, 2017. (Tata, Vivek) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/21 6:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yuriy Yaroslavskiy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Yaroslavskiy, Yuriy) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/19 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Joseph Pfuhler on behalf of Tobin L Etlis (aty to be noticed) (Pfuhler, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Mon 04/17 6:11 PM
Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Toyota Lease Trust (Aaron, Clifford) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/14 1:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Lease Trust identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Lease Trust. (Aaron, Clifford) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 04/14 12:42 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 04/14 12:42 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/14 10:42 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toyota Lease Trust re1 Notice of Removal, (Aaron, Clifford) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/13 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Lease Trust from Supreme Court, Richmond County, case number 150237/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9447802) (Aaron, Clifford) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit TLT's Verified Answer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Co-Defendant Etlis' Answer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Demand for Ad Damnum and Response, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Co-defendant's Written Consent to Removal, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/14 12:41 PM
Case assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |