Liu v. Kelly et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lashann Dearcy Hall |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02244 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Secretary, US DHS John F. Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Acting Chair Lori Scialabba
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zehao Liu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 09/07 3:45 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs complaint against Defendants and all claims therein be and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), without costs or fees to any party as against any other. Signed by the Clerk of Court Deputy Clerk Janet Hamilton on 9/7/2017. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 09/07 12:56 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties to the above captioned action. Plaintiff ZEHAO LIU and defendants JOHN F. KELLY, SECRETARY,UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and LORI SCIALABBA,ACTING DIRECTOR OF UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATIONSERVICES, by and through their undersigned attorneys, that Plaintiffs complaint against Defendants and all claims therein be and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), without costs or fees to any party as against any other. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in this case dismissing the action with prejudice and shall close the case. So Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 9/5/2017. (Forward for Judgment) (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/25 10:38 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by John F. Kelly, Lori Scialabba (Greene, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/20 10:11 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Move with Respect to the Complaint by John F. Kelly, Lori Scialabba. (Greene, Sean) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 06/20 3:27 PM
ORDER: Defendants' June 20, 2017 motion7 for an extension of time is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 3, 2017. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 6/20/2017. (Valentin, Winnethka) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/21 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Greene on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Greene, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 6:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zehao Liu. John F. Kelly served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017; Lori Scialabba served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. (Li, Jim) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 04/17 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to John F. Kelly, Lori Scialabba, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/17 2:29 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/17 2:27 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/17 2:26 PM
Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/13 7:44 PM
COMPLAINT Zehao Liu against John F. Kelly, Lori Scialabba filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9449228 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Zehao Liu. (Li, Jim) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit |