Smith v. The City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02246 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Police Officer Brian T Draheim
|
|
Defendant
Police Officer William Erdman
|
|
Defendant
Sergeant Pandullo
|
|
Defendant
The City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/31 2:39 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/31/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/31 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The City of New York executed by both parties (Connelly, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Mon 07/17 5:38 PM
First MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment briefing schedule due to plaintiff's pending voluntary dismissal by The City of New York. (Connelly, Elizabeth) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Stay Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/17 6:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court having been advised that plaintiff intends to voluntarily dismiss this action, the case is dismissed, subjected to reinstatement at the request of any party within 30 days. Defendants' motion to stay is denied as moot10 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/17/2017. (Cogan, Brian) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Transcript
Wed 06/21 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 15, 2017, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rivka Teich, Telephone number 7186132268. Email address: rivkateich@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 7/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2017. (Teich, Rivka) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 06/15 5:43 PM
Minute Entry and Order for Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/15/2017. Both sides present. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due 7/17/2017; plaintiff's opposition 8/28/2017; reply 9/4/2017. (Court Reporter: Rivka Teich). (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Wed 05/31 12:07 PM
Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/31/2017. Both sides present. By 6/2/2017 defendants must provide plaintiff with any 911 reports or transcripts from plaintiff's and Shannon Young's purported 911 calls and serve a subpoena to testify at a deposition on Young. Young's deposition must be completed by 6/14/2017. A status conference is scheduled for 6/15/2017 at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 8D South. The parties should bring to the conference the transcript of Young's deposition and be prepared to discuss the status of the case in light of the deposition. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Case Management Statement
Fri 05/26 4:07 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT pursuant to the Court's Order dated April 17, 2017 (Connelly, Elizabeth) |
|
Sunday, May 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Sun 05/14 5:04 PM
ORDER granting7 The City of New York's Motion for Extension of Time to File its Answer to 6/23/2017. The Initial Status Conference, however, will proceed as previously scheduled for 5/31/2017 since the Court does not wait for answers to be filed as they are not required in planning discovery set at the conference. Parties are therefore reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements set forth at5 . In addition, plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE at the conference why sanctions should not be imposed for his failure to serve the appropriate releases with the summons and complaint as required by this Court's order. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/14/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 05/12 3:37 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by The City of New York. (Connelly, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/04 12:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Smith. Brian T Draheim served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. (Akakwam, Philip) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/17 5:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 5/31/2017 at 11:15 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/17/2017. (Clarke, Melonie) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/17 4:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Brian T Draheim, William Erdman, Pandullo, The City of New York. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/17 4:17 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/17 4:17 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/17 4:16 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/13 8:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9449261 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Robert Smith. (Akakwam, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |