The Estate of Thomas Sauickie, Jr. et al v. City of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02662 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332wd Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:43 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Moises M. Clase
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Caridad A. Clase
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
The Estate of Thomas Sauickie, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
City Of New York
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Caridad A. Clase
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Moises M. Clase
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Fire Department of the City of New York
|
|
Cross Defendant
The Estate of Thomas Sauickie, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Chloe Sauickie
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Tracie J. Orr
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
New York City Police Department
|
|
Cross Defendant
John Does (1-5)
|
|
Cross Defendant
Fire Department of New York City Emergency Medical Services
|
|
Cross Defendant
Moises M. Clase
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
City Of New York
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
ABC Corp., (1-5)
|
|
Defendant
Fire Department of New York City Emergency Medical Services
|
|
Defendant
Caridad A. Clase
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fire Department of the City of New York
|
|
Defendant
John Does (1-5)
|
|
Defendant
City Of New York
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
New York City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
ABC Corp., (1-5)
|
|
Defendant
Moises M. Clase
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chloe Sauickie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Thomas Sauickie, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracie J. Orr
|
Represented By
|
1. | Wrongful death lawsuit filed after NJ man struck and killed, NYPD came hours later (nj.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/24/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |