Williams et al v. State Collection Service Inc
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela Pepper |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00532 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:11 AM CDT |
Defendant
State Collection Service Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Morehouse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/07 5:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice and without costs by Mark Morehouse, Kimberly Morgan, James Williams. (Eldridge, Mark) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Thu 08/08 9:16 AM
Case Terminated (vkb) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Mon 06/24 4:11 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Blythin, John) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 06/04 4:59 PM
Minute and Order Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pamela Pepper: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2019.13 Defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim DENIED.16 Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings DENIED. Amended/updated Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 6/21/2019. (cb) |
|
23 | 23
audio
Audio docketing digital upload
Tue 05/28 12:34 PM
Audio of motions hearing held on 05/28/2019 at 10:03 a.m.; File Size(35.5 MB) (kgw) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/28 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ben J Slatky on behalf of Mark Morehouse, Kimberly Morgan, James Williams. Attorney(s) appearing: Ben J. Slatky (Slatky, Ben) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Fri 02/08 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings: Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Judge Pamela Pepper. Parties wishing to appear by phone may do so by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4893665#. Note: if necessary, the parties should be prepared to discuss scheduling at this hearing. (cc: all counsel)(cb) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 05/11 10:41 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Mark Morehouse, Kimberly Morgan, James Williams re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Blythin, John) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion Response to Motion
Thu 04/26 9:36 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by State Collection Service Inc re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ., RESPONSE to Motion filed by State Collection Service Inc re 16 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS . (McDorman, David) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/06 2:56 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Mark Morehouse, Kimberly Morgan, James Williams re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Note - this brief is a combined brief addressing both parties' cross-motions for judgment on the pleadings. This document is identical to the brief filed at Dkt. No. 17 . (Blythin, John) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 04/06 2:54 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Mark Morehouse, Kimberly Morgan, James Williams re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Blythin, John) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 04/06 2:53 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Mark Morehouse, Kimberly Morgan, James Williams. (Blythin, John) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
order
Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 03/14 3:57 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/14/2018 re15 Stipulation to Set a Briefing Schedule for the Parties' Cross-Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Vacate or Stay the Scheduling Order. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation. The court ORDERS that the plaintiffs will file a cross motion for judgment on the pleadings and response to the defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings by the end of the day on April 6, 2018. The court ORDERS that the defendant will file a reply brief in support of its motion for judgment on the pleadings and a response to the plaintiff's motion by the end of the day on April 27, 2018; if the defendant files a single brief combining response and reply, the page limit for a response brief applies. The court ORDERS that the plaintiffs will file a reply brief in support of their motion for judgment on the pleadings by the end of the day on May 14, 2018. The court further ORDERS that the scheduling order entered October 12, 2017, dkt. no. 12, is STAYED pending the court's ruling on the parties' cross motions for judgment on the pleadings. The court further ORDERS that3 the plaintiff's motion for class certification is WITHDRAWN without prejudice. (Note: there is no document associated with this text only order.) (cc: all counsel)(cb) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Mon 03/12 12:25 PM
STIPULATION TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON THE PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND TO VACATE OR STAY THE SCHEDULING ORDER by All Plaintiffs.(Blythin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON THE PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND TO VACATE OR STAY THE SCHEDULING ORDER | ||
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Thu 03/08 3:55 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (McDorman, David) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 03/08 3:53 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants. (McDorman, David) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 10/12 10:00 AM
Court Minutes and Order RE: Proceedings held before Judge Pamela Pepper: Scheduling Conference held on 10/12/2017, (Initial Discovery due by 10/26/2017, Amended Motion for Class Certification due by 3/29/2018, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 7/19/2018, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 8/9/2018, Fact and Expert Discovery due by 9/13/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2018). (kgw) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Tue 10/03 11:31 AM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Blythin, John) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
Thu 09/07 9:45 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of withdrawal of counsel (Eldridge, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 06/27 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/12/2017 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Judge Pamela Pepper. Parties may appear by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4893665#. On or before 10/5/2017, parties to file joint Rule 26(f) plan. (cc: all counsel)(cb) Modified on 6/27/2017 (vkb) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/21 4:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by State Collection Service Inc.(McDorman, David) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/15 6:05 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by State Collection Service Inc. (McDorman, David) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/15 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M McDorman on behalf of State Collection Service Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: David M. McDorman (McDorman, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/17 12:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Collection Service Inc - Waiver sent on 4/26/2017. (Eldridge, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/24 2:37 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs. (Eldridge, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Certify Class Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Relief
Tue 04/18 2:50 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/18/2017 re3 MOTION to Certify Class (Campbell-Ewald; Damasco), MOTION to Stay briefing on the motion to Certify Class until an amended motion is filed, MOTION for Relief from the local rules requiring briefs and supporting materials to be filed with the motion and the automatic briefing schedule filed by plaintiff: The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion to stay the class certification motion until such time as the plaintiff files an amended class certification motion. The court further GRANTS the plaintiff's motion asking for relief from the automatic briefing schedule required by the local rules for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. (cc: all counsel)(pwm) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/14 10:07 AM
Summons Issued as to State Collection Service Inc. (bx) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Certify Class Stay Relief
Thu 04/13 3:52 PM
MOTION to Certify Class (Campbell-Ewald; Damasco) , Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay briefing on the motion to Certify Class until an amended motion is filed , Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from the local rules requiring briefs and supporting materials to be filed with the motion and the automatic briefing schedule by Mark Morehouse, Kimberly Morgan, James Williams. (Blythin, John) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/13 3:51 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Mark Morehouse, Kimberly Morgan, James Williams. (Blythin, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/13 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against State Collection Service Inc by James Williams, Mark Morehouse, Kimberly Morgan. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2558630)(Blythin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons on Defendant | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 04/13 4:01 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (lls) |