Vadiviezo Fernandez v. Mumford
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Richard D Bennett |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01023 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 28:2241 Habeas Corpus: INS |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 07/05 12:20 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; a Certificate of Appealability shall not issue. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/5/2017. (c/m 7/5/2017) (ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Rule 12/56
Wed 07/05 9:40 AM
(FILED IN ERROR) Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Rory Vadiviezo Fernandez (ko, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/5/2017 (ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 07/03 12:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Garry Mumford(LeDuc, Vickie) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Memo of Law | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/18 2:20 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Respondent to show cause within 60 days. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/18/2017. (c/m & emailed 4/18/2017) (ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/14 9:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rory N. Vadiviezo Fernandez(ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 04/14 9:32 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rory N. Vadiviezo Fernandez.(ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |