The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Weaver et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Richard D Bennett |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01034 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1335 Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Shawn Brown
31 N. Poppelton St.
Baltimore, MD 21218 |
|
Defendant
Stephen Brown
650 Ames Place
Williamsport, PA 17701 |
|
Defendant
Dennie Weaver
Colorado Mental Health Institute 1600 W 24th St.
Pueblo, CO 81003 |
|
Defendant
Devashae Weaver
1019 Brantley Ave.
Baltimore, MD 21217 |
|
Defendant
Sequoia Weaver
4800 Yellowwood Ave. Apt. 41
Baltimore, MD 21209 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Terminated: 08/21/2017
751 Broad St.
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and Order
Mon 03/05 12:05 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER that this case be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED, subject to re-opening with respect to the remaining funds upon resolution of criminal proceedings in Colorado. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/5/2018. (c/m 3/5/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/5/2018 (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Correspondence
Thu 09/28 3:04 PM
Correspondence from Stephen Brown re: status of case(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 08/21 12:34 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Discharge, Dismissal and Other Relief in Interpleader by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/21/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/16 6:34 PM
MOTION Motion for Discharge, Dismissal and Other Relief in Interpleader by The Prudential Insurance Company of America |
|
Att: 1 Brief In Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Check
Tue 06/27 4:58 PM
Check Received on 6/27/2017 from Prudential Insurance Company of America. Check Number: 3260861900. Amount: $4000.00. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 06/22 3:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Devashae Weaver waiver sent on 6/9/2017, answer due 8/8/2017 |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Deposit Funds
Wed 06/21 2:02 PM
ORDER for Deposit of Remanding Death Benefit. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/21/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Deposit Funds
Fri 06/16 4:45 PM
MOTION to Deposit Funds - Motion for Deposit of Remaining Death Benefit by The Prudential Insurance Company of America |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum ISO of Motion for Deposit of Remaining Death Benefit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 06/15 4:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Stephen Brown waiver sent on 6/9/2017, answer due 8/8/2017 |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 06/15 4:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Sequoia Weaver waiver sent on 6/9/2017, answer due 8/8/2017 |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/09 12:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Dennie Weaver served on 5/25/2017, answer due 6/15/2017 |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/01 5:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Shawn Brown served on 5/23/2017, answer due 6/13/2017 |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/19 6:51 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Other Affiliate Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/17 4:05 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Shawn Brown, Stephen Brown, Dennie Weaver, Devashae Weaver and Sequoia Weaver.(slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 04/17 3:52 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America was filed incorrectly. 103.3 Corporate Disclosure should not have been filed as a attachment to the complaint. Please refile. Please review redaction policy of Court and file the unredacted version of exhibits. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 11:39 PM
COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Shawn Brown, Stephen Brown, Dennie Weaver, Devashae Weaver, Sequoia Weaver ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6608921.), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Disclosure of Affiliations and Financial Interest, | ||
Att: 7 Summons for the Clerk's Office to Issue, | ||
Att: 8 Summons for the Clerk's Office to Issue, | ||
Att: 9 Summons for the Clerk's Office to Issue, | ||
Att: 10 Summons for the Clerk's Office to Issue, | ||
Att: 11 Summons for the Clerk's Office to Issue |