Rossmann v. Berryhill, et al.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Theodore D Chuang |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01015 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405id Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/29 2:10 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice; directing clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/28/2017. (c/m 8/29/2017 aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/19 3:42 PM
ORDER denying3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff must file a new Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 21 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/19/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m as directed 4/19/17) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/14 10:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brud Rossmann. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/14 10:01 AM
PROPOSED NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons by Brud Rossmann re1 Complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 9:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill, John Doe-1, John Doe-2, John Doe-3, filed by Brud Rossmann.(dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Fed Ex Envelope |