Gustafson v. United States of America
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Jarrod Hazel |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01032 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:2672 Federal Tort Claims Act - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Gustafson
as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Anthony G. Passaro, Deceased 3305 Flagstone Dr.
Melissa, TX 75454 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Eugene S. Craig, Jr., M.D.
Terminated: 07/24/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/05 10:35 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States of America(Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 09/03 2:32 PM
Third Amended Scheduling ORDER granting40 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: Status Report Now Due by September 9, 2019. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/30/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 06/04 1:50 PM
Settlement Conference held on 6/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. (kcs, Chambers) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/03 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roann Nichols on behalf of All Defendants (Nichols, Roann) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 05/06 9:18 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct39 Scheduling Order by United States of America(Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/11 11:53 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/9/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Thu 03/07 12:00 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Rescheduling the Settlement Conference at the parties' request. The settlement conference will now take place on June 4, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are to submit ex parte communications to the court by no later than May 21, 2019; Plaintiff shall submit a written demand to the Defendant by no later than May 21, 2019. Defendant shall submit a written offer to the Plaintiff by no later than May 28, 2019. Parties are to provide copies of ALL of the above referenced documents to Chambers at the time of the exchange. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms on 3/7/2019. (ozs, Chambers) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
corresp
Miscellaneous
Thu 02/07 12:08 PM
Correspondence re: Request to Reschedule Settlement Conference (Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 02/07 12:07 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct34 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,30 Scheduling Order and for Entry of Second Amended Scheduling Order by United States of America(Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/01 3:57 PM
ORDER scheduling a settlement conference for Tuesday, April 16, 2019 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 2/1/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 01/08 2:00 PM
ORDER granting33 Consent Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/7/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 11/13 1:41 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to modify scheduling order by Theresa Gustafson, Maria Wilson(Stein, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order order | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/13 8:55 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for settlement conference. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/13/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
corresp
Miscellaneous
Fri 10/26 3:03 PM
Correspondence re: request for early ADR and initial report (Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/18 9:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/17/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 11/01 3:33 PM
Status Telephone Conference held on 10/17/2018 before Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (jcs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
corresp
Conference - setting
Mon 10/15 11:12 AM
Paperless Correspondence setting status call for October 17, 2018 at 5:30pm. Plaintiff counsel shall contact defense counsel and then call chambers with both counsel on the line. (Hazel, George) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 05/01 11:28 AM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by United States of America.(Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/26 10:53 AM
NOTICE by Theresa Gustafson, Maria Wilson to Dismiss Defendant Dr. Eugene Craig, Jr. (Stein, Jesse) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Tue 04/17 12:59 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Consolidate Cases; directing the clerk to Administratively close Civil Case No. 8:18-cv-00507-GJH. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/13/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 03/30 10:23 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ian Gil Thomas terminated. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 3/30/2018. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 03/29 5:50 PM
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Theresa Gustafson(Thomas, Ian) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 03/02 4:37 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases Wrongful Death Action and Survivors Action by Theresa Gustafson(Stein, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 09/15 3:32 PM
ORDER granting21 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/15/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stay
Wed 09/13 4:42 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by United States of America(Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 08/28 5:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/28/2017. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/24 12:08 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in response to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Response to Amended Complaint by United States of America(Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 08/23 9:21 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc8 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/23/2017. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Local Rule
Mon 08/21 11:44 AM
Local Rule 103.6(c) - Comparison Copy of the First Amended Complaint(Thomas, Ian) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/18 4:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Theresa Gustafson.(Thomas, Ian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Original SF-95 (Redacted), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Email Exchange between Stein and Blair, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Pending Wrongful Death SF-95 (Redacted) | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/18 4:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Theresa Gustafson.(Thomas, Ian) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 08/08 12:04 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 CONSENT Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/8/2017. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 08/08 11:23 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Dismiss by Theresa Gustafson(Thomas, Ian) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/08 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Gil Thomas on behalf of Theresa Gustafson (Thomas, Ian) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Rule 12/56
Thu 08/03 11:30 AM
Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Theresa Gustafson (c/m 08/03/2017 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Fri 07/28 5:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America(Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/24 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Theresa Gustafson (Thomas, Ian) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 06/20 2:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Eugene S. Craig, Jr., MD, United States of America(Marzullo, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 04/24 9:34 AM
Summons Issued 60 days as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 9:33 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Eugene S. Craig, Jr., MD.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/17 8:59 AM
NOTICE by Theresa Gustafson re1 Complaint Summons to Eugene Craig, Jr. M.D. (Stein, Jesse) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/17 8:58 AM
NOTICE by Theresa Gustafson re1 Complaint Summons to United States of America (U.S. Attorney) (Stein, Jesse) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/17 8:57 AM
NOTICE by Theresa Gustafson re1 Complaint Summons to United States of America (Stein, Jesse) |
|
2 | 2
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 04/17 8:15 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Theresa Gustafson was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments are missing - Summons. If the defendant is either an agency of the United States or an officer or employee of the United States, you must serve both the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland, as well as each defendant. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to 1 . (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6608101.), filed by Theresa Gustafson.(Stein, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Order of Transfer, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/14 1:50 PM
Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |