Udechukwu v. Gamestop Corp. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William F Kuntz, II |
Referred: | Roanne L Mann |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02261 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
P.O. Delsano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher Doll
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gamestop Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brittany Long
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anselm Udechukwu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 09/24 4:59 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the City Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in its entirety; that the Gamestop Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in its entirety; and that this case is closed.Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 9/24/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
15
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 09/21 1:35 PM
DECISION and ORDER: The City Defendants' motion to dismiss36 is GRANTED in its entirety, and the Gamestop Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED24 in its entirety. Because this Decision and Order dismisses all claims in this action, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 24 and 36 to close the case. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 9/20/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Saturday, April 14, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
23
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Sat 04/14 4:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,38 Declaration,37 Memorandum in Support filed by Anselm Udechukwu. (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
respoth
Reply in Support
Fri 04/13 4:15 PM
REPLY in Support re36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
38 | 38
misc
Declaration
Fri 04/13 4:13 PM
DECLARATION re36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
37 | 37
25
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Fri 04/13 4:11 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 04/13 4:09 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/06 10:50 AM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/06 11:01 AM
ORDER granting35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 4/6/2018. (Choudhury, Farhana) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/04 3:11 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 4/4/2018. (Choudhury, Farhana) |
||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 03/29 5:05 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 03/22 5:05 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 03/22 5:44 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 3/22/2018. (Choudhury, Farhana) |
||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice(Other)
Fri 03/02 9:16 PM
NOTICE by Anselm Udechukwu Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 02/27 12:04 PM
ORDER re30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; The application is granted. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 02/22 3:50 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Anselm Udechukwu. (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 01/24 11:10 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 2/22/2018 Replies due by 2/26/2018. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/26/2018. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 1/24/2018. (Jackson, Andrew) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 01/22 5:48 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Anselm Udechukwu. (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Fri 12/22 1:46 PM
Letter advising the Court of service of the City Defendants' opening brief for their motion to dismiss by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 12/07 10:52 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Extension of Time to File. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 12/7/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 12/06 6:04 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File (to serve motion to dismiss) by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
16
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Mon 11/13 9:41 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gamestop Corp. and Britanny Long filed by Anselm Udechukwu. (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respoth
Reply in Support
Thu 11/09 4:29 PM
REPLY in Support re24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Gamestop Corp., Brittany Long. (Mulholland, Mark) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 11/09 4:27 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gamestop Corp., Brittany Long. (Mulholland, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark S. Mulholland, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Mon 10/30 10:12 AM
Letter Regarding service of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. by Anselm Udechukwu (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 10/20 11:53 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Motion to Dismiss) by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 10/20 1:53 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time. The City Defendants' motion must be served on or before December 7, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition, if any, must be served on or before January 8, 2018; the City Defendants' reply, if any, must be served on or before January 29, 2018. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/20/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
Sunday, October 15, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sun 10/15 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nana Kwame Sarpong on behalf of P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Sarpong, Nana) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Fri 09/22 2:20 PM
Letter informing Court of service of Motion to Dismiss by Gamestop Corp., Brittany Long (Mulholland, Mark) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 09/11 4:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Lichterman, Ariel) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 09/11 6:09 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 09/11/2017. (Kuntz, William) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Tue 08/15 9:53 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court notes that the pre-motion conference is scheduled for August 29, 2017, and the parties are to appear before the Court on that date. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/15/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/15 9:55 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are ordered to appear for a pre-motion conference in this action on August 29, 2017, at 12:00 Noon in Courtroom 6H North before the Hon. William F. Kuntz, II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/15/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 08/14 5:06 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference by P.O. Delsano, Christopher Doll, The City of New York. (Lichterman, Ariel) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Mon 07/17 11:40 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in substantial part, on consent,15 Motion to Compel. The deadline for the City defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to August 14, 2017 . The motion to compel production of the section 160.50 authorization is terminated as moot. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/17/2017. (Pauley, Anders) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/14 7:14 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Anselm Udechukwu (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to the Response to the Order to Show Cause | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 07/14 12:55 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled on July 19, 2017 by 1:00 p.m. by Anselm Udechukwu. (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 07/14 1:04 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference to Tuesday, August 29, 2017 at 12:00 Noon. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/14/2017. (Kuntz, William) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 07/14 1:05 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is hereby adjourned to Wednesday, August 23, 2017, at 12:30 P.M. in Courtroom 6H North before the Honorable William F. Kuntz, II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/14/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 07/14 5:08 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER: The pre-motion conference originally scheduled for July 19, 2017, is hereby adjourned to August 29, 2017, at 12:00 Noon in Courtroom 6H North before Judge William F. Kuntz, II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/14/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Compel
Tue 07/11 4:05 PM
Letter MOTION to Compel Releases and to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by The City of New York. (Lichterman, Ariel) |
|
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/11 4:51 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re15 Letter MOTION to Compel Releases and to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint filed by The City of New York. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to show cause, via ECF, by July 14, 2017, why the relief requested by the City should not be granted and why plaintiff's counsel should not be admonished for ignoring this Court's Order of May 15, 2017 and the repeated inquiries of counsel for the City. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/11/2017. (Proujansky, Josh) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 06/23 3:01 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by The City of New York. (Lichterman, Ariel) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 06/23 3:18 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The pre-motion conference initially scheduled for June 26, 2017, is hereby adjourned to July 19, 2017, at 1:00 P.M. in Courtroom 6H North before the Honorable William F. Kuntz, II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/23/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Thu 06/15 1:32 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Letter from Mark S. Mulholland, Esq. to Hon. William F. Kuntz, II requesting a pre-motion conference and permission to file a motion to dismiss by Gamestop Corp., Brittany Long. (Mulholland, Mark) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Thu 06/15 3:24 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The pre-motion conference is scheduled for June 26, 2017, at 12:30 P.M. in Courtroom 6H North before the Honorable William F. Kuntz, II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/15/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/30 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Mulholland on behalf of Brittany Long (aty to be noticed) (Mulholland, Mark) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 05/19 11:44 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move or otherwise respond (1st request for defendant Long) by Gamestop Corp., Brittany Long. (Kartez, Ross) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/19 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ross J. Kartez on behalf of Brittany Long (aty to be noticed) (Kartez, Ross) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 05/19 12:06 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Gamestop Corp. and Brittany Long shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before June 15, 2017. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 5/19/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 05/15 11:01 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, on consent,9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The City of New York and officers Delsano and Doll must respond to the complaint by July 11, 2017 . Counsel are directed to promptly arrange for the preparation, execution and processing of the referenced releases. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/15/2017. (Pauley, Anders) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 05/12 1:35 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Consent by The City of New York. (Lichterman, Ariel) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/09 12:25 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Gamestop Corp.. (Kartez, Ross) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/09 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ross J. Kartez on behalf of Gamestop Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Kartez, Ross) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/09 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Mulholland on behalf of Gamestop Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Mulholland, Mark) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 05/09 12:51 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Gamestop Corp. shall answer, move, or otherwise respond by June 1, 2017. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 5/9/2017. (Harris, Emily) |
||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 05/09 12:55 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by Gamestop Corp. Application granted, on consent. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/9/2017. (Kelson, Lise) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/18 1:21 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/18 1:20 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/18 1:19 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/18 12:52 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Anselm Udechukwu (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
notice
Notice(Other)
Tue 04/18 11:10 AM
NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/18 1:18 PM
Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT Udechukwu against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9451286 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Anselm Udechukwu. (Ofodile, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |