Williams v. Constar Financial Services LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lashann Dearcy Hall |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02270 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Constar Financial Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfredo Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago |
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order(Other)
Mon 07/17 2:41 PM
ORDER granted re: doc.11 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Constar Financial Services LLC. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff ALFREDO WILLIAMS ("Plaintiff) and Defendant CONSTAR FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ("Defendant") that the above-captioned action, inclusive of all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Hearings
Fri 07/14 8:10 AM
In light of the filing of the stipulation of dismissal, the conference scheduled for July 17th is canceled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/14/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 07/13 7:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Constar Financial Services LLC (Marshall, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Order
Tue 06/20 11:02 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re10 Notice of Settlement filed by Alfredo Williams. The settlement conference scheduled for June 27th will instead be held at 10:0 a.m. on July 17th unless the stipulation of dismissal is filed by July 13th. Settlement positions will now be due July 14th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/20/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 06/15 7:26 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Alfredo Williams (Litvak, Igor) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/06 1:14 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Constar Financial Services LLC. (Marshall, Adam) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/06 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Matthew Marshall on behalf of Constar Financial Services LLC (aty to be noticed) (Marshall, Adam) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 06/06 2:07 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Constar Financial Services LLC answer due 7/6/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/6/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 05/25 12:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person conference will be held at 3:30 p.m. on June 27, 2017 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N324 in the North Wing. The individual Plaintiff client and a principal with full settlement authority for Defendant must personally appear with counsel at the conference. Counsel are directed to submit their respective settlement position letters via ex parte electronic filing no later than June 23rd. If the case does not settle during this conference, the Court will set a discovery schedule. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/25/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/23 1:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfredo Williams. Constar Financial Services LLC served on 5/16/2017, answer due 6/6/2017. (Litvak, Igor) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/24 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Cohen on behalf of Alfredo Williams (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/20 3:59 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/20 3:58 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 6:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Constar Financial Services LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9452152 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Alfredo Williams. (Litvak, Igor) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |