Sholl v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret B Seymour |
Referred: | Paige J Gossett |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-00974 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Judgment
Tue 08/28 5:05 PM
JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the decision of the Commissioner is affirmed. (bshr, ) |
|
31 | 31
7
pgs
order
Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation
Tue 08/28 5:02 PM
OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 25 Report and Recommendation, affirming the decision of the Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 08/28/2018. (bshr, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Reply Not to a Motion
Tue 07/10 3:01 PM
REPLY by Commissioner of Social Security Administration to26 Objection to Report and Recommendation . (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Thu 06/28 10:34 PM
OBJECTION to25 Report and Recommendation by Troy J Sholl. Reply to Objections due by 7/12/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Wendt, Robertson) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 06/14 12:49 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint - Social Security, recommending the decision of the Commissioner be affirmed. Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 07/14/2018. (bshr, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Plaintiff's Social Security Response Brief
Tue 01/16 7:59 AM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE BRIEF by Troy J Sholl. (Wendt, Robertson) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
respoth
Defendant's Social Security Brief
Tue 01/02 2:37 PM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Response Brief Due by 1/16/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 12/15 3:01 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting without objection 18 Motion for Extension of Time. Based on the reasons stated in the Defendant's motion, the court finds good cause pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.02 (D.S.C.) to suspend Local Civil Rule 83.VII.05 (D.S.C.). Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/15/2017. (kkus, ) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 12/14 3:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Response to Motion due by 12/28/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Plaintiff's Social Security Brief
Mon 11/06 9:06 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Troy J Sholl. Defendant Brief due by 12/18/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Wendt, Robertson) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 10/24 4:12 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting without objection 14 Second Motion for Extension of Time. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/24/2017. (kkus, ) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 10/23 2:10 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Troy J Sholl. Response to Motion due by 11/6/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Wendt, Robertson) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 10/02 4:55 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting without objection 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/02/2017. (kkus, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 09/26 3:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Troy J Sholl. Response to Motion due by 10/10/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Wendt, Robertson) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Social Security Administrative Record
Tue 08/22 12:36 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration VOLUME 2 OF 2 .(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Att: 1 Addendum Medical Records - Part 5, | ||
Att: 2 Addendum Medical Records - Part 6, | ||
Att: 3 Addendum Medical Records - Part 7, | ||
Att: 4 Addendum Medical Records - Part 8, | ||
Att: 5 Addendum Medical Records - Part 9, | ||
Att: 6 Addendum Medical Records - Part 10 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Social Security Administrative Record
Tue 08/22 12:34 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration VOLUME 1 OF 2 .(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Att: 1 Addendum Index, | ||
Att: 2 Addendum Documents Related to Admin. Process/Oral Hearing, | ||
Att: 3 Addendum Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Addendum Jurisdictional Documents and Notices - Part 1, | ||
Att: 5 Addendum Jurisdictional Documents and Notices - Part 2, | ||
Att: 6 Addendum Non Disability Related Developments, | ||
Att: 7 Addendum Disability Related Developments - Part 1, | ||
Att: 8 Addendum Disability Related Developments - Part 2, | ||
Att: 9 Addendum Medical Records - Part 1, | ||
Att: 10 Addendum Medical Records - Part 2, | ||
Att: 11 Addendum Medical Records - Part 3, | ||
Att: 12 Addendum Medical Records - Part 4 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer in Social Security Case
Tue 08/22 12:27 PM
ANSWER by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA-Social Security Complaint Served
Thu 06/08 2:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy J Sholl. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 4/24/2017, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 8/22/2017.(Wendt, Robertson) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Certified Receipts | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 05/02 1:25 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that he is responsible for service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(1) unless he provides the court with completed USM-285 forms so that service can be effected by the U.S. Marshal's Service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). If service is not effected within 90 days, this action will be recommended for dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 5/2/2017. (kkus, ) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/14 2:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bshr, ) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/14 2:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Troy J Sholl. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(bshr, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security Cases Only
Fri 04/14 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Troy J Sholl. Service due by 7/13/2017(bshr, ) |