All et al v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | J Michelle Childs |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00968 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
AstraZeneca LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty All
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James All
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Tue 08/08 2:58 PM
Case transferred to New Jersey per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 2789. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (asni, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/01 8:57 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/1/2017.(asni, ) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Mon 07/31 5:20 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A London ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7284571) by Betty All, James All. Response to Motion due by 8/14/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Marcum, Christiaan) |
|
Att: 1 Application for Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/31 10:34 AM
TEXT ORDER granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. in case 1:17-cv-00968-JMC; granting (12) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. in case 6:17-cv-01045-JMC; granting (5) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. in case 1:17-cv-01597-JMC; granting (5) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. in case 3:17-cv-01904-JMC Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/31/2017.Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00968-JMC, 1:17-cv-01597-JMC, 3:17-cv-01904-JMC, 6:17-cv-01045-JMC(asni, ) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Fri 07/28 4:04 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mahesh Nair ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7281822) by Betty All, James All. Response to Motion due by 8/11/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Marcum, Christiaan) |
|
Att: 1 Application for Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 06/30 3:56 PM
TEXT ORDER granting (9) Motion to Stay in case 1:17-cv-00968-JMC; granting (10) Motion to Stay in case 6:17-cv-01045-JMC. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/30/2017.Associated Cases: 6:17-cv-01045-JMC, 1:17-cv-00968-JMC(asni, ) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Stay
Fri 06/30 2:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay ACTION PENDING A DECISION FROM THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ON MOTION TO TRANSFER by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Willis, Marguerite) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Motion for Transfer, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Unpublished Decision | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Tue 06/27 11:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betty All. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 6/16/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. (London, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Tue 06/27 11:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betty All. AstraZeneca LP served on 6/16/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. (London, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/20 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Sofia Svedberg on behalf of AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Svedberg, Sara) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/20 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marguerite S Willis on behalf of AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Willis, Marguerite) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/17 4:11 PM
Summons Issued as to AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (asni, ) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 04/14 10:05 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Betty All, James All.(mbro, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7102672), filed by James All, Betty All. Service due by 7/12/2017(mbro, ) |