Springman v. Pioneer Credit Company
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00964 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Pioneer Credit Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Korey Springman
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Republic Finance LLC
Terminated: 06/07/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/08 10:52 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Pioneer Credit Company by Korey Springman. (Maxfield, David) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Tue 10/10 9:56 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/10/2017. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order
Wed 10/04 11:53 AM
CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 19 Motion for Confidentiality Order Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/4/2017.(sshe, ) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 10/04 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Pioneer Credit Company by Korey Springman (Maxfield, David) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Confidentiality Order
Tue 10/03 3:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Pioneer Credit Company. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Caskey, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 07/14 2:38 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Korey Springman.(Maxfield, David) |
|
17 | 17
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 07/14 2:28 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Pioneer Credit Company.(Caskey, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Rule 26 Discovery Plan
Tue 07/11 11:04 AM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Pioneer Credit Company.(Caskey, Mary) |
|
15 | 15
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 07/11 11:01 AM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Pioneer Credit Company.(Caskey, Mary) (Main Document 15 replaced on 7/11/2017) (sshe, ). Modified on 7/11/2017 to replace with corrected signature document provided by filing user (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 06/16 12:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Republic Finance, LLC, Only by Korey Springman. (Maxfield, David) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/09 4:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/30/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/14/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 7/14/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/7/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/11/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/6/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/13/2017, Discovery due by 12/6/2017, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 12/20/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 3/5/2018 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/9/2017. (sshe, ) |
|
12 | 12
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 06/09 3:18 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pioneer Credit Company.(Becker, James) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/09 3:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Pioneer Credit Company.(Becker, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Tue 06/06 3:50 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Republic Finance LLC. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/7/2017. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 05/26 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Republic Finance, LLC by Korey Springman (Maxfield, David) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/11 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary McFarland Caskey on behalf of Pioneer Credit Company (Caskey, Mary) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/11 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Y Becker on behalf of Pioneer Credit Company (Becker, James) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Mon 05/01 4:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Korey Springman. Republic Finance LLC served on 4/28/2017, answer due 5/19/2017.(Maxfield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Addendum Certified Mail Receipt, Republic Finance, LLC | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Mon 05/01 4:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Korey Springman. Pioneer Credit Company served on 4/28/2017, answer due 5/19/2017.(Maxfield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt, Pioneer Credit Company | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 04/14 10:45 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Korey Springman. (egra, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/14 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Pioneer Credit Company, Republic Finance LLC. (egra, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons - Republic Finance LLC | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 10:43 AM
COMPLAINT against Pioneer Credit Company, Republic Finance LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7102540.), filed by Korey Springman. Service due by 7/12/2017 (egra, ) |