Horvath et al v. American Strategic Insurance
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | David C Norton |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00966 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
American Strategic Insurance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Horvath
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaylin Horvath
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 10/10 9:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by American Strategic Insurance. (Morgan, Grenville) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Fri 08/18 1:29 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/18/2017. (jbry, ) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 06/16 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by American Strategic Insurance (Morgan, Grenville) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/24 2:18 PM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/15/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 6/15/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/29/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/15/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/16/2017, Discovery due by 11/20/2017, Motions due by 12/11/2017, Jury Selection Deadline 1/30/2018, ADR Statement due by 12/30/2017, Mediation Due by 1/29/2018, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/24/2017. (jbry, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 05/23 10:59 AM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by American Strategic Insurance.(Morgan, Grenville) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Consend Amended Scheduling Order | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/03 1:00 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/22/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/15/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 6/15/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/29/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/19/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/20/2017, Discovery due by 8/21/2017, Motions due by 9/11/2017, Jury Selection Deadline 11/1/2017, ADR Statement due by 10/1/2017, Mediation Due by 10/31/2017, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/3/2017. (jbry, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal
Wed 04/26 1:22 PM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Dorchester County.(Morgan, Grenville) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents Acknowledgment executed by Clerk of Court | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 04/20 12:42 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Horvath, Kaylin Horvath.(Butaitis, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/18 1:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by American Strategic Insurance.(Morgan, Grenville) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 04/14 8:56 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Strategic Insurance.(jbry, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/14 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017-CP 18-00297 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7102668), filed by American Strategic Insurance.(jbry, ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents |