Bilbro v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00971 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Bilbro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/25 3:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (McTighe Mellen, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Mediation Order
Tue 06/06 3:52 PM
ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION Mediation Due by 11/25/2017 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/6/2017. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
discov
Rule 26 Discovery Plan
Fri 06/02 3:32 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(McTighe Mellen, Mary) |
|
6 | 6
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 06/02 3:23 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(McTighe Mellen, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Mediation Statement | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/03 4:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/19/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/2/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 6/2/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/27/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/28/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/25/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/2/2017, Discovery due by 10/25/2017, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 11/8/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 2/1/2018 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/3/2017. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/28 12:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(McTighe Mellen, Mary) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 04/14 10:30 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (egra, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/14 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017-cp 10-1210 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7103422), filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (egra, ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents |