Brooks v. Trustmark Insurance Company
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret B Seymour |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00975 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Trustmark Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary L Brooks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/31 3:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Trustmark Insurance Company. |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 11/27 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Identify Experts. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/27/2017.(mdea ) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 11/22 12:06 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time by Trustmark Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 12/6/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses
Tue 11/21 2:05 PM
DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Trustmark Insurance Company |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 11/13 2:42 PM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER(Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/15/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/15/2018, Discovery due by 4/16/2018, Motion in Limine due by 7/30/2018, Motions due by 4/30/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/16/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 8/20/2018, ADR Statement due by 6/4/2018, Mediation Due by 7/2/2018) Motions terminated: 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Trustmark Insurance Company. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/13/2017. (mdea ) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 11/13 11:13 AM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct26 Amended Scheduling Order by Trustmark Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel Modified on 11/13/2017 to correct motion relief, to link to correct entry, and to correct attachment description (mdea, ) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 08/23 11:08 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER( Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/16/2017,, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/15/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/15/2017, Discovery due by 1/16/2018, Motion in Limine due by 4/30/2018, Motions due by 1/30/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/16/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 5/21/2018, ADR Statement due by 3/5/2018, Mediation Due by 4/2/2018) Motions terminated: 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Trustmark Insurance Company. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/23/2017. (mdea ) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Wed 08/23 11:04 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 24 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/22/2017.(mdea ) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Protective Order
Fri 08/18 2:17 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Trustmark Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 9/1/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order | ||
23 | 23
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 08/18 2:16 PM
MOTION to amend/correct9 Conference and Scheduling Order by Trustmark Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 9/1/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel Modified on 8/18/2017 to correct motion relief, to link to correct entry, and to delete proposed order that was s/signed with the judge's name by the filer (mdea, ) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 05/26 3:42 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trustmark Insurance Company |
|
21 | 21
misc
Entry Deletion
Fri 05/26 10:54 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 18 Reason: document was re-filed rather than emailed to Clerk as instructed; Corrected Filing Document Number20 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 5/25/2017 Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A (mdea ) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Entry Deletion
Fri 05/26 8:32 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 17 Reason: entry is incomplete; was re-filed at entry 18 Corrected Filing Document Number 18 Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A (mdea ) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 05/26 10:10 AM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Mary L Brooks.(Bradley, J) Modified on 5/26/2017 to edit filing date (mdea, ) |
|
Att: 1 LR 26.03 Answers by Plaintiff | ||
18 | 18
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 05/25 5:20 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by Mary L Brooks.(Bradley, J) |
|
Att: 1 LR 26.03 Answers | ||
17 | 17
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 05/25 4:26 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by Mary L Brooks.(Bradley, J) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Entry Deletion
Thu 05/25 3:53 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 15 Reason: Rule 26(a)(1) intitial disclosures are not filed Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A (mdea ) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/08 2:16 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 12 Motion for Lance Clack to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 5/8/2017.(mdea ) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/08 11:31 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 11 Motion for Andrew Jubinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 5/8/2017.(mdea ) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Fri 05/05 3:10 PM
First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lance V. Clack ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7139220) by Trustmark Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 5/19/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Fri 05/05 3:08 PM
First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew G. Jubinsky ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7139184) by Trustmark Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 5/19/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 05/02 9:53 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mary L Brooks.(Bradley, J) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/20 10:02 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 5/25/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/19/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/19/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/18/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/18/2017, Discovery due by 10/17/2017, Motion in Limine due by 1/30/2018, Motions due by 11/1/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/16/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 2/20/2018, ADR Statement due by 12/4/2017, Mediation Due by 1/2/2018. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 4/20/2017. (mdea ) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Reply Not to a Motion
Thu 04/20 9:21 AM
REPLY by Trustmark Insurance Company to4 Order Concerning Removal . |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/20 9:19 AM
Trustmark Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Trustmark Insurance Company |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal
Fri 04/14 3:45 PM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Filing Notice of Removal | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Fri 04/14 2:38 PM
ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Trustmark Insurance Company. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 4/14/2017. (mdea ) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 04/14 2:35 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trustmark Insurance Company.(mdea ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/14 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Common Pleas, case number 2017-CP 40-1489 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7104018), filed by Trustmark Insurance Company.(mdea ) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert J. Swan, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Documents |