Lee v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Coggins, Jr |
Referred: | Kaymani D West |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00965 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees per rule 406b
Tue 04/14 10:29 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees pursuant to the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) 37 is GRANTED in the amount of $23,837.25. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to return $4,250.00 previously awarded under the EAJA to Plaintiff after he receives the payment of the § 406(b) fees. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/14/2020. (hcic, ) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Thu 02/13 8:57 AM
RESPONSE in Support re37 MOTION for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b Response filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (Bowens, Barbara) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Attorney Fees per Rule 406b
Thu 01/16 4:25 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b by Daphne Regina Lee. Response to Motion due by 2/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Mayes, W) Modified on 1/16/2020 to edit Response date. (gnan, ) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Assignment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Statement of time | ||
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 12/13 11:44 AM
ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA in the amount of $4,250.00, with $16.00 in expenses, for a total of $4,266.00. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/13/2018.(gnan ) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation
Tue 11/20 12:10 PM
STIPULATION re32 MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (Bowens, Barbara) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 11/07 5:02 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA by Daphne Regina Lee. Response to Motion due by 11/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Mayes, W) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Assignment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Statement of costs, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of net worth, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Statement of time | ||
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Judgment
Thu 08/09 11:45 AM
JUDGMENT: The decision of the Commissioner is reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further evaluation of Plaintiff's claim. (gnan ) |
|
30 | 30
7
pgs
order
Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation
Thu 08/09 11:17 AM
OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court adopts the Report, reverses the decision of the Commissioner, and remands pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further evaluation of Plaintiff's claim. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/9/2018. (gnan ) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Fri 05/11 10:33 AM
OBJECTION to25 Report and Recommendation by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Reply to Objections due by 5/25/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bowens, Barbara) (Modified on 5/11/2018 to replace document with corrected case number verified by filing user). (gnan ) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Report and Recommendation
Mon 04/30 3:48 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint - Social Security, filed by Daphne Regina Lee: The undersigned recommends that this matter be reversed and remanded for further administrative proceedings under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/30/2018..(gnan ) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Wed 12/13 10:53 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respoth
Defendant's Social Security Brief
Wed 11/29 8:21 AM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Response Brief Due by 12/13/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bowens, Barbara) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respoth
Plaintiff's Social Security Brief
Fri 10/20 12:37 AM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Daphne Regina Lee. Defendant Brief due by 11/29/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Mayes, W) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 10/05 9:14 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff's brief now due by 10/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/5/2017.(gnan ) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 10/04 11:30 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time file Plaintiff's Brief by Daphne Regina Lee. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Mayes, W) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 09/13 5:00 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's brief is now due October 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 09/13/2017.(dsto, ) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 09/13 4:29 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time file Plaintiff's Brief by Daphne Regina Lee. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Mayes, W) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Social Security Administrative Record
Wed 08/16 11:04 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration .(Bowens, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Addendum Index, | ||
Att: 2 Addendum Documents Related to Admin. Process/Oral Hearing, | ||
Att: 3 Addendum Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Addendum Jurisdictional Documents and Notices - Part 1, | ||
Att: 5 Addendum Jurisdictional Documents and Notices - Part 2, | ||
Att: 6 Addendum Non Disability Related Developments, | ||
Att: 7 Addendum Disability Related Developments, | ||
Att: 8 Addendum Medical Records - Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Addendum Medical Records - Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Addendum Medical Records - Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Addendum Medical Records - Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 Addendum Medical Records - Part 5 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer in Social Security Case
Wed 08/16 11:00 AM
ANSWER by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/15/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Bowens, Barbara) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA-Social Security Complaint Served
Thu 04/27 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daphne Regina Lee. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 4/19/2017, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 8/17/2017.(Mayes, W) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/19 10:14 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/19/2017.(gnan ) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/14 8:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 7/13/2017. (gnan ) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/14 8:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daphne Regina Lee. Response to Motion due by 4/27/2017. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(gnan ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security Cases Only
Fri 04/14 8:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Daphne Regina Lee. Service due by 7/12/2017.(gnan ) |