Nesse et al v. Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Magnuson |
Referred: | Franklin L Noel |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01168 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Fun |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Ryan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Pufahl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Olson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Nesse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Mackey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Braastad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dave Borst
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Bartz
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 22 2018
ORDER granting 40 Motion for Entry of Judgment.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 8/22/2018. (ALT) |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
50 | 50
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Wed 08/29 9:44 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, Dan Olson, Dave Borst, John Bartz, John Nesse, Mark Ryan, Tammy Braastad, Tim Mackey, Todd Pufahl against Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc.(MMG) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
49 | 49
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 08/22 8:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2018 re40 MOTION for Entry of Judgment. Written order to issue. (Court Reporter Deb Beauvais) (las) |
|
48 | 48
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment
Wed 08/22 11:49 AM
ORDER granting40 Motion for Entry of Judgment.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 8/22/2018. (ALT) |