Jordan et al v. Bayer Corp. et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Ross |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01330 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer A.G.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer Essure, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Effie Alfred
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Farentina Austin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kishani Banks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kortni Barrett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacey Blackwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sabrina Blevins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Botts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doretha Bradley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Brooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christy Burke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mieko Burrage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Cagle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anjanettte Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Temeka Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Contreres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamika Cotter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Coulter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daja Culton-Sexton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheila Dailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lakita Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Dean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yamilla Del La Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Dempsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Devillez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Dotson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexandria Earles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marlena Farmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Farone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roberta Fields
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ariane Figueroa de Andrade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Fitting
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Torrie Freeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ginerva Grady
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Insley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lashonda Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leah Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Jacobs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miranda Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ciara Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Kerns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Holli Ketteler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Konkler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Lamb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christy Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Lester-Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nadia Liddon-Roupe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amarilis Mesura
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashante Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alisa Montgomery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherika Moreland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Quiana Morrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristina O'Neal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Oates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ebeni Passmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gina Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Pierce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarina Plumley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anita Polk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorraine Pucciarelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chelsy Ragan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cristina Rainey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelli Revel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latanya Rhodes-Stiger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candace Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Silvia Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonya Ruffin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omaris Semprit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sable Shill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanna Sifuentes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latoya Skinner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Romaria Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alicia Solis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francine Spang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bailey Steele
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Taradena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atiyeh Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lafreida Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christy Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Tollin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Faith Ward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Ward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Ware
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayla Wheeler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Summer White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renonda Whitehead
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chauntae Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lataya Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meta Willis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Wombles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Woods
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Yates
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Memorandum Opinion Order of Remand
Wed 05/10 9:05 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand13 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions in this case are DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/10/2017. (CLO) (Copy of Order and Docket Sheet Mailed to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/04 3:21 PM
NOTICE Supplemental Authority: by Plaintiffs Effie Alfred, Farentina Austin, Kishani Banks, Kortni Barrett, Stacey Blackwell, Sabrina Blevins, Jessica Botts, Doretha Bradley, April Brooks, April Bryant, Christy Burke, Mieko Burrage, Jessica Cagle, Anjanettte Campbell, Mary Collins, Michelle Collins, Temeka Collins, Crystal Contreres, Tamika Cotter, Jamie Coulter, Daja Culton-Sexton, Sheila Dailey, Lakita Davis, Kimberly Dean, Yamilla Del La Cruz, Donna Dempsey, Barbara Devillez, Lori Dotson, Alexandria Earles, Marlena Farmer, Carrie Farone, Roberta Fields, Ariane Figueroa de Andrade, Amy Fitting, Torrie Freeman, Amanda Gibson, Ginerva Grady, Diana Insley, Lashonda Jackson, Leah Jackson, Erica Jacobs, Michelle Jones, Miranda Jones, Ciara Jordan, Nicole Kerns, Holli Ketteler, Jennifer Konkler, Tiffany Lamb, Christy Lee, Teresa Lester-Davis, Nadia Liddon-Roupe, Amarilis Mesura, Ashante Miller, Crystal Miller, Alisa Montgomery, Sherika Moreland, Quiana Morrow, Michelle Nelson, Kristina O'Neal, Jamie Oates, Ebeni Passmore, Gina Patterson, Jessica Pierce, Sarina Plumley, Anita Polk, Lorraine Pucciarelli, Chelsy Ragan, Cristina Rainey, Kelli Revel, Latanya Rhodes-Stiger, Candace Roberts, Rachel Robinson, Silvia Rodriguez, Sonya Ruffin, Omaris Semprit, Sable Shill, Joanna Sifuentes, Latoya Skinner, Romaria Smith, Alicia Solis, Francine Spang, Bailey Steele, Jennifer Taradena, Atiyeh Taylor, Lafreida Thomas, Christy Thompson, Angela Tollin, Faith Ward, Jessica Ward, Sarah Ware, Kayla Wheeler, Summer White, Renonda Whitehead, Chauntae Williams, Lataya Williams, Meta Willis, Samantha Wombles, Theresa Woods, Dawn Yates re13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis City(Holland, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 05/04 7:56 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis City filed by Plaintiffs Effie Alfred, Farentina Austin, Kishani Banks, Kortni Barrett, Stacey Blackwell, Sabrina Blevins, Jessica Botts, Doretha Bradley, April Brooks, April Bryant, Christy Burke, Mieko Burrage, Jessica Cagle, Anjanettte Campbell, Mary Collins, Michelle Collins, Temeka Collins, Crystal Contreres, Tamika Cotter, Jamie Coulter, Daja Culton-Sexton, Sheila Dailey, Lakita Davis, Kimberly Dean, Yamilla Del La Cruz, Donna Dempsey, Barbara Devillez, Lori Dotson, Alexandria Earles, Marlena Farmer, Carrie Farone, Roberta Fields, Ariane Figueroa de Andrade, Amy Fitting, Torrie Freeman, Amanda Gibson, Ginerva Grady, Diana Insley, Lashonda Jackson, Leah Jackson, Erica Jacobs, Michelle Jones, Miranda Jones, Ciara Jordan, Nicole Kerns, Holli Ketteler, Jennifer Konkler, Tiffany Lamb, Christy Lee, Teresa Lester-Davis, Nadia Liddon-Roupe, Amarilis Mesura, Ashante Miller, Crystal Miller, Alisa Montgomery, Sherika Moreland, Quiana Morrow, Michelle Nelson, Kristina O'Neal, Jamie Oates, Ebeni Passmore, Gina Patterson, Jessica Pierce, Sarina Plumley, Anita Polk, Lorraine Pucciarelli, Chelsy Ragan, Cristina Rainey, Kelli Revel, Latanya Rhodes-Stiger, Candace Roberts, Rachel Robinson, Silvia Rodriguez, Sonya Ruffin, Omaris Semprit, Sable Shill, Joanna Sifuentes, Latoya Skinner, Romaria Smith, Alicia Solis, Francine Spang, Bailey Steele, Jennifer Taradena, Atiyeh Taylor, Lafreida Thomas, Christy Thompson, Angela Tollin, Faith Ward, Jessica Ward, Sarah Ware, Kayla Wheeler, Summer White, Renonda Whitehead, Chauntae Williams, Lataya Williams, Meta Willis, Samantha Wombles, Theresa Woods, Dawn Yates. (Holland, Eric) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 05/04 7:53 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiffs Effie Alfred, Farentina Austin, Kishani Banks, Kortni Barrett, Stacey Blackwell, Sabrina Blevins, Jessica Botts, Doretha Bradley, April Brooks, April Bryant, Christy Burke, Mieko Burrage, Jessica Cagle, Anjanettte Campbell, Mary Collins, Michelle Collins, Temeka Collins, Crystal Contreres, Tamika Cotter, Jamie Coulter, Daja Culton-Sexton, Sheila Dailey, Lakita Davis, Kimberly Dean, Yamilla Del La Cruz, Donna Dempsey, Barbara Devillez, Lori Dotson, Alexandria Earles, Marlena Farmer, Carrie Farone, Roberta Fields, Ariane Figueroa de Andrade, Amy Fitting, Torrie Freeman, Amanda Gibson, Ginerva Grady, Diana Insley, Lashonda Jackson, Leah Jackson, Erica Jacobs, Michelle Jones, Miranda Jones, Ciara Jordan, Nicole Kerns, Holli Ketteler, Jennifer Konkler, Tiffany Lamb, Christy Lee, Teresa Lester-Davis, Nadia Liddon-Roupe, Amarilis Mesura, Ashante Miller, Crystal Miller, Alisa Montgomery, Sherika Moreland, Quiana Morrow, Michelle Nelson, Kristina O'Neal, Jamie Oates, Ebeni Passmore, Gina Patterson, Jessica Pierce, Sarina Plumley, Anita Polk, Lorraine Pucciarelli, Chelsy Ragan, Cristina Rainey, Kelli Revel, Latanya Rhodes-Stiger, Candace Roberts, Rachel Robinson, Silvia Rodriguez, Sonya Ruffin, Omaris Semprit, Sable Shill, Joanna Sifuentes, Latoya Skinner, Romaria Smith, Alicia Solis, Francine Spang, Bailey Steele, Jennifer Taradena, Atiyeh Taylor, Lafreida Thomas, Christy Thompson, Angela Tollin, Faith Ward, Jessica Ward, Sarah Ware, Kayla Wheeler, Summer White, Renonda Whitehead, Chauntae Williams, Lataya Williams, Meta Willis, Samantha Wombles, Theresa Woods, Dawn Yates. (Holland, Eric) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
A Docket Text Order
Mon 05/01 11:37 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:18 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/1/17. (JAB) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 04/28 5:30 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/28 5:29 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis City filed by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.) |
|
18 | 18
motion
File in Excess of Page Limitation
Fri 04/28 5:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
A Docket Text Order
Fri 04/21 12:12 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:12 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs(Holland, Eric),3 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memo of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/21/17. (JAB) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 04/21 11:12 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re15 MOTION to Stay ,4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Sever filed by Plaintiffs Effie Alfred, Farentina Austin, Kishani Banks, Kortni Barrett, Stacey Blackwell, Sabrina Blevins, Jessica Botts, Doretha Bradley, April Brooks, April Bryant, Christy Burke, Mieko Burrage, Jessica Cagle, Anjanettte Campbell, Mary Collins, Michelle Collins, Temeka Collins, Crystal Contreres, Tamika Cotter, Jamie Coulter, Daja Culton-Sexton, Sheila Dailey, Lakita Davis, Kimberly Dean, Yamilla Del La Cruz, Donna Dempsey, Barbara Devillez, Lori Dotson, Alexandria Earles, Marlena Farmer, Carrie Farone, Roberta Fields, Ariane Figueroa de Andrade, Amy Fitting, Torrie Freeman, Amanda Gibson, Ginerva Grady, Diana Insley, Lashonda Jackson, Leah Jackson, Erica Jacobs, Michelle Jones, Miranda Jones, Ciara Jordan, Nicole Kerns, Holli Ketteler, Jennifer Konkler, Tiffany Lamb, Christy Lee, Teresa Lester-Davis, Nadia Liddon-Roupe, Amarilis Mesura, Ashante Miller, Crystal Miller, Alisa Montgomery, Sherika Moreland, Quiana Morrow, Michelle Nelson, Kristina O'Neal, Jamie Oates, Ebeni Passmore, Gina Patterson, Jessica Pierce, Sarina Plumley, Anita Polk, Lorraine Pucciarelli, Chelsy Ragan, Cristina Rainey, Kelli Revel, Latanya Rhodes-Stiger, Candace Roberts, Rachel Robinson, Silvia Rodriguez, Sonya Ruffin, Omaris Semprit, Sable Shill, Joanna Sifuentes, Latoya Skinner, Romaria Smith, Alicia Solis, Francine Spang, Bailey Steele, Jennifer Taradena, Atiyeh Taylor, Lafreida Thomas, Christy Thompson, Angela Tollin, Faith Ward, Jessica Ward, Sarah Ware, Kayla Wheeler, Summer White, Renonda Whitehead, Chauntae Williams, Lataya Williams, Meta Willis, Samantha Wombles, Theresa Woods, Dawn Yates. (Holland, Eric) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stay
Fri 04/21 11:10 AM
MOTION to Stay by Plaintiffs Effie Alfred, Farentina Austin, Kishani Banks, Kortni Barrett, Stacey Blackwell, Sabrina Blevins, Jessica Botts, Doretha Bradley, April Brooks, April Bryant, Christy Burke, Mieko Burrage, Jessica Cagle, Anjanettte Campbell, Mary Collins, Michelle Collins, Temeka Collins, Crystal Contreres, Tamika Cotter, Jamie Coulter, Daja Culton-Sexton, Sheila Dailey, Lakita Davis, Kimberly Dean, Yamilla Del La Cruz, Donna Dempsey, Barbara Devillez, Lori Dotson, Alexandria Earles, Marlena Farmer, Carrie Farone, Roberta Fields, Ariane Figueroa de Andrade, Amy Fitting, Torrie Freeman, Amanda Gibson, Ginerva Grady, Diana Insley, Lashonda Jackson, Leah Jackson, Erica Jacobs, Michelle Jones, Miranda Jones, Ciara Jordan, Nicole Kerns, Holli Ketteler, Jennifer Konkler, Tiffany Lamb, Christy Lee, Teresa Lester-Davis, Nadia Liddon-Roupe, Amarilis Mesura, Ashante Miller, Crystal Miller, Alisa Montgomery, Sherika Moreland, Quiana Morrow, Michelle Nelson, Kristina O'Neal, Jamie Oates, Ebeni Passmore, Gina Patterson, Jessica Pierce, Sarina Plumley, Anita Polk, Lorraine Pucciarelli, Chelsy Ragan, Cristina Rainey, Kelli Revel, Latanya Rhodes-Stiger, Candace Roberts, Rachel Robinson, Silvia Rodriguez, Sonya Ruffin, Omaris Semprit, Sable Shill, Joanna Sifuentes, Latoya Skinner, Romaria Smith, Alicia Solis, Francine Spang, Bailey Steele, Jennifer Taradena, Atiyeh Taylor, Lafreida Thomas, Christy Thompson, Angela Tollin, Faith Ward, Jessica Ward, Sarah Ware, Kayla Wheeler, Summer White, Renonda Whitehead, Chauntae Williams, Lataya Williams, Meta Willis, Samantha Wombles, Theresa Woods, Dawn Yates. (Holland, Eric) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 04/21 11:02 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis City filed by Plaintiffs Effie Alfred, Farentina Austin, Kishani Banks, Kortni Barrett, Stacey Blackwell, Sabrina Blevins, Jessica Botts, Doretha Bradley, April Brooks, April Bryant, Christy Burke, Mieko Burrage, Jessica Cagle, Anjanettte Campbell, Mary Collins, Michelle Collins, Temeka Collins, Crystal Contreres, Tamika Cotter, Jamie Coulter, Daja Culton-Sexton, Sheila Dailey, Lakita Davis, Kimberly Dean, Yamilla Del La Cruz, Donna Dempsey, Barbara Devillez, Lori Dotson, Alexandria Earles, Marlena Farmer, Carrie Farone, Roberta Fields, Ariane Figueroa de Andrade, Amy Fitting, Torrie Freeman, Amanda Gibson, Ginerva Grady, Diana Insley, Lashonda Jackson, Leah Jackson, Erica Jacobs, Michelle Jones, Miranda Jones, Ciara Jordan, Nicole Kerns, Holli Ketteler, Jennifer Konkler, Tiffany Lamb, Christy Lee, Teresa Lester-Davis, Nadia Liddon-Roupe, Amarilis Mesura, Ashante Miller, Crystal Miller, Alisa Montgomery, Sherika Moreland, Quiana Morrow, Michelle Nelson, Kristina O'Neal, Jamie Oates, Ebeni Passmore, Gina Patterson, Jessica Pierce, Sarina Plumley, Anita Polk, Lorraine Pucciarelli, Chelsy Ragan, Cristina Rainey, Kelli Revel, Latanya Rhodes-Stiger, Candace Roberts, Rachel Robinson, Silvia Rodriguez, Sonya Ruffin, Omaris Semprit, Sable Shill, Joanna Sifuentes, Latoya Skinner, Romaria Smith, Alicia Solis, Francine Spang, Bailey Steele, Jennifer Taradena, Atiyeh Taylor, Lafreida Thomas, Christy Thompson, Angela Tollin, Faith Ward, Jessica Ward, Sarah Ware, Kayla Wheeler, Summer White, Renonda Whitehead, Chauntae Williams, Lataya Williams, Meta Willis, Samantha Wombles, Theresa Woods, Dawn Yates. (Holland, Eric) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 04/21 11:00 AM
MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis City by Plaintiffs Effie Alfred, Farentina Austin, Kishani Banks, Kortni Barrett, Stacey Blackwell, Sabrina Blevins, Jessica Botts, Doretha Bradley, April Brooks, April Bryant, Christy Burke, Mieko Burrage, Jessica Cagle, Anjanettte Campbell, Mary Collins, Michelle Collins, Temeka Collins, Crystal Contreres, Tamika Cotter, Jamie Coulter, Daja Culton-Sexton, Sheila Dailey, Lakita Davis, Kimberly Dean, Yamilla Del La Cruz, Donna Dempsey, Barbara Devillez, Lori Dotson, Alexandria Earles, Marlena Farmer, Carrie Farone, Roberta Fields, Ariane Figueroa de Andrade, Amy Fitting, Torrie Freeman, Amanda Gibson, Ginerva Grady, Diana Insley, Lashonda Jackson, Leah Jackson, Erica Jacobs, Michelle Jones, Miranda Jones, Ciara Jordan, Nicole Kerns, Holli Ketteler, Jennifer Konkler, Tiffany Lamb, Christy Lee, Teresa Lester-Davis, Nadia Liddon-Roupe, Amarilis Mesura, Ashante Miller, Crystal Miller, Alisa Montgomery, Sherika Moreland, Quiana Morrow, Michelle Nelson, Kristina O'Neal, Jamie Oates, Ebeni Passmore, Gina Patterson, Jessica Pierce, Sarina Plumley, Anita Polk, Lorraine Pucciarelli, Chelsy Ragan, Cristina Rainey, Kelli Revel, Latanya Rhodes-Stiger, Candace Roberts, Rachel Robinson, Silvia Rodriguez, Sonya Ruffin, Omaris Semprit, Sable Shill, Joanna Sifuentes, Latoya Skinner, Romaria Smith, Alicia Solis, Francine Spang, Bailey Steele, Jennifer Taradena, Atiyeh Taylor, Lafreida Thomas, Christy Thompson, Angela Tollin, Faith Ward, Jessica Ward, Sarah Ware, Kayla Wheeler, Summer White, Renonda Whitehead, Chauntae Williams, Lataya Williams, Meta Willis, Samantha Wombles, Theresa Woods, Dawn Yates. (Holland, Eric) |
|
12 | 12
motion
File in Excess of Page Limitation
Fri 04/21 10:56 AM
MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Effie Alfred, Farentina Austin, Kishani Banks, Kortni Barrett, Stacey Blackwell, Sabrina Blevins, Jessica Botts, Doretha Bradley, April Brooks, April Bryant, Christy Burke, Mieko Burrage, Jessica Cagle, Anjanettte Campbell, Mary Collins, Michelle Collins, Temeka Collins, Crystal Contreres, Tamika Cotter, Jamie Coulter, Daja Culton-Sexton, Sheila Dailey, Lakita Davis, Kimberly Dean, Yamilla Del La Cruz, Donna Dempsey, Barbara Devillez, Lori Dotson, Alexandria Earles, Marlena Farmer, Carrie Farone, Roberta Fields, Ariane Figueroa de Andrade, Amy Fitting, Torrie Freeman, Amanda Gibson, Ginerva Grady, Diana Insley, Lashonda Jackson, Leah Jackson, Erica Jacobs, Michelle Jones, Miranda Jones, Ciara Jordan, Nicole Kerns, Holli Ketteler, Jennifer Konkler, Tiffany Lamb, Christy Lee, Teresa Lester-Davis, Nadia Liddon-Roupe, Amarilis Mesura, Ashante Miller, Crystal Miller, Alisa Montgomery, Sherika Moreland, Quiana Morrow, Michelle Nelson, Kristina O'Neal, Jamie Oates, Ebeni Passmore, Gina Patterson, Jessica Pierce, Sarina Plumley, Anita Polk, Lorraine Pucciarelli, Chelsy Ragan, Cristina Rainey, Kelli Revel, Latanya Rhodes-Stiger, Candace Roberts, Rachel Robinson, Silvia Rodriguez, Sonya Ruffin, Omaris Semprit, Sable Shill, Joanna Sifuentes, Latoya Skinner, Romaria Smith, Alicia Solis, Francine Spang, Bailey Steele, Jennifer Taradena, Atiyeh Taylor, Lafreida Thomas, Christy Thompson, Angela Tollin, Faith Ward, Jessica Ward, Sarah Ware, Kayla Wheeler, Summer White, Renonda Whitehead, Chauntae Williams, Lataya Williams, Meta Willis, Samantha Wombles, Theresa Woods, Dawn Yates.(Holland, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Tue 04/18 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Rankin, W.) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Mon 04/17 9:54 AM
Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY
Mon 04/17 9:46 AM
Petition Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Ariane Figueroa de Andrade, Roberta Fields, Summer White, Jessica Pierce, Sheila Dailey, Rachel Robinson, Jessica Botts, Francine Spang, Barbara Devillez, Sabrina Blevins, Tamika Cotter, Silvia Rodriguez, Michelle Collins, Nicole Kerns, Alisa Montgomery, Lafreida Thomas, Omaris Semprit, Lori Dotson, Samantha Wombles, Quiana Morrow, Ebeni Passmore, Daja Culton-Sexton, Lataya Williams, Kayla Wheeler, April Bryant, Christy Thompson, Torrie Freeman, Mieko Burrage, Renonda Whitehead, Romaria Smith, Tiffany Lamb, Jessica Ward, Chauntae Williams, Latoya Skinner, Anita Polk, Marlena Farmer, Teresa Lester-Davis, Leah Jackson, Sarina Plumley, Theresa Woods, Michelle Nelson, Erica Jacobs, Jessica Cagle, Mary Collins, Bailey Steele, Amarilis Mesura, Kristina O'Neal, Sherika Moreland, Sonya Ruffin, Lorraine Pucciarelli, Holli Ketteler, Faith Ward, Joanna Sifuentes, Jamie Coulter, Gina Patterson, Crystal Miller, Chelsy Ragan, Candace Roberts, Cristina Rainey, Effie Alfred, Crystal Contreres, Ciara Jordan, Sarah Ware, Carrie Farone, Jennifer Taradena, Donna Dempsey, Alexandria Earles, Atiyeh Taylor, Sable Shill, Lashonda Jackson, Temeka Collins, Kelli Revel, Jamie Oates, Christy Lee, Kimberly Dean, Ashante Miller, Alicia Solis, Lakita Davis, Miranda Jones, Christy Burke, Yamilla Del La Cruz, Anjanettte Campbell, Dawn Yates, Stacey Blackwell, Angela Tollin, Farentina Austin, Amanda Gibson, Meta Willis, April Brooks, Nadia Liddon-Roupe, Jennifer Konkler, Doretha Bradley, Diana Insley, Latanya Rhodes-Stiger, Kishani Banks, Amy Fitting, Ginerva Grady, Michelle Jones, Kortni Barrett.(MFG) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Fri 04/14 2:52 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC.. (Rankin, W.) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 04/14 2:50 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re7 MOTION to Sever filed by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC.(Rankin, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
7 | 7
motion
Sever
Fri 04/14 2:49 PM
MOTION to Sever by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Fri 04/14 2:44 PM
MEMORANDUM re5 Memorandum in Support of Motion - Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC.(Rankin, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M | ||
5 | 5
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 04/14 2:33 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 04/14 2:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.) |
|
3 | 3
motion
File in Excess of Page Limitation
Fri 04/14 2:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memo of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Rankin, W.) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Fri 04/14 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Rankin, W.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal Petition
Fri 04/14 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri, case number 1722-CC00608, with receipt number 0865-5910794, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Corp..(Rankin, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Original Filing Form |