Lopez et al v. Liska et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00526 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Filing Fee Paid in Full
Mon 05/03 3:26 PM
FILING FEE PAID IN FULL (bx) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Mon 12/04 9:13 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/4/2017. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Lopez)(mac) |
|
22 | 22
5
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 12/04 9:04 AM
ORDER ADOPTING20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/4/2017. Lopez's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice.12 Motion to Appoint Counsel and2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee are Denied as Moot. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Lopez and Warden)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 11/28 3:43 PM
OBJECTION (Unsigned) to20 Report and Recommendations filed by Roberto I Lopez.(mac) |
|
Att: 1 Bookmarked Exhibits | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Report and Recommendations ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/16 2:53 PM
RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS ACTION FOR LACK OF DILIGENCE signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 11/16/2017. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) and E.D. Wis. Civ. L. R. 41(c). Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to plaintiff and warden)(amb) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 10/12 10:46 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING NON-PAYMENT OF INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 10/11/17. On or before November 1, 2017, the plaintiff shall either pay the initial partial filing fee or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to pay. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden, CCI)(kah) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Documents Received
Wed 09/13 12:14 PM
DOCUMENTS RECEIVED from Roberto I Lopez. (kah) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Tue 09/05 12:01 PM
ORDER that on or before 9/26/17 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 13.37 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 9/5/17. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden at CCI)(kah) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Fri 09/01 12:03 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Roberto I Lopez. (kah) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Supplement
Fri 08/18 4:17 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Roberto I Lopez. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Original Document
Tue 08/08 11:40 AM
DOCUMENTS filed in support of12 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Robert I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Tue 08/08 11:36 AM
LETTER to the Clerk of Court from Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 08/08 11:18 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Supplement
Tue 08/08 11:11 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS (with bookmarks) filed by Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/08 11:00 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Almodovar, Michael A Dittmann, Alfredo Gutierrez, Kathy Hein, Gilbert Hernandez, Frank Liska, Jr, Alfonso Morales, Abner Valcarcel, Fernando A Viera, Mark Williams filed by Roberto I Lopez.(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit J.D.H | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/05 3:31 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 7/5/17. Consistent with this Order, Mr. Lopez shall file an amended complaint on or before August 7, 2017. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff w/complaint form)(kah) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/30 4:50 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 06/29 3:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/29/2017. Court discusses plaintiff's three pending cases. Court directs plaintiff to file an amended complaint and a consent/refusal form in Case 17-cv-526. The Court will issue orders addressing each of the three cases. (Tape #10:14:23-10:41:45) (kah) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 06/27 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Status Conference set for 6/30/2017 10:00 AM HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 6/29/2017 10:00 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The court will initiate the call to Mr. Lopez. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff/Petitioner)(kah) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 06/20 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/30/2017 10:00 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The court will initiate the call to Mr. Lopez. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff/Petitioner)(kah) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate
Wed 05/24 11:02 AM
SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones and a full six month trust account statement be filed within 14 days. (kah) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter (From Court)
Tue 05/16 2:32 PM
LETTER from the Clerk to Robert I Lopez regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel)(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Fri 04/14 3:13 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form and full prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (amb) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Fri 04/14 3:08 PM
PARTIAL Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Roberto Lopez. (amb) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 04/14 3:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Roberto Lopez. (amb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Prisoner
Fri 04/14 3:06 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Roberto Lopez.(amb) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment |